(PS) Khan v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Khalid N Khan and Khalid N. Khan
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and U.S. Bank Com, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00267
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 MAIL RETURNED as Not Deliverable as Addressed: #3 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), sent to Khalid N. Khan. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 5, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Findings and Recommendations, served on Khalid N. Khan. (Reader, L)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/4/2021 RECOMMENDING #2 that plaintiffs request to proceed in forma be Granted, but that the complaint be Dismissed with prejudice because it is barred by the doctrine of res judicata. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these F & R's.(Reader, L) Modified on 3/5/2021 (Reader, L).
February 11, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Kastilahn, A)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Khalid N Khan. (Kastilahn, A)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank National Association by Khalid N Khan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Khan v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Com, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalid N Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalid N. Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?