Larsen, et al., v. Sweet Emotion
Plaintiff: Debbie Larsen and Scott Larsen
Defendant: Sweet Emotion and Clinton Jones
Claimant: Elaine Ilderton and Ox Bow Marina
Counter Claimant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company, Hanover Insurance Company, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company and Ace American Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00390
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE re Service of Orders, Magistrate Consent, and Availability of VDRP by Debbie Larsen, Scott Larsen. (Sciacca, John)
April 26, 2021 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sciacca, John)
April 22, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: On April 20, 2021, Claimant, Elaine Ilderton, filed a motion for a 90-day extension of time to submit to the Court additional substantiating information, evidence, documentation, etc., that supports Claimant's assertions of Plaintiffs' negligence in this matter. See ECF No. #20 . Claimant also requests that the Court compel Plaintiffs to provide Claimant a copy of the vessel's marine survey report and other related documentation. The Court GRANTS Claimant's request for a 90-day extension of time but DENIES Claimant's request to compel without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
April 22, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: 21 Minute Order served on Elaine Ilderton, Clinton Jones and Sweet Emotion. (Michel, G.)
April 20, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for 90-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to submit additional information by Elaine Ilderton. (Kaminski, H)
April 16, 2021 Filing 19 COUNTERCLAIM by Ox Bow Marina.(Shkolnikov, Lilla) Modified on 4/19/2021 (Kaminski, H).
April 16, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER by Ox Bow Marina.(Shkolnikov, Lilla)
April 16, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM against Debbie Larsen, Scott Larsen by Ace American Insurance Company. Attorney Ou, C. Joseph added. by Ace American Insurance Company. Attorney Ou, C. Joseph added.(Ou, C. Joseph)
April 16, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM against Debbie Larsen, Scott Larsen by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. Attorney Ou, C. Joseph added. by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. Attorney Ou, C. Joseph added.(Ou, C. Joseph)
April 16, 2021 Filing 15 SERVICE BY PUBLICATION filed by Debbie Larsen, Scott Larsen. Last publication date 4/4/21. (Sciacca, John)
April 15, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Clinton Jones to #1 Complaint. (Coll, A)
April 14, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Hanover Insurance Company. by Hanover Insurance Company.(Shkolnikov, Lilla)
April 14, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER by Hanover Insurance Company.(Shkolnikov, Lilla)
April 7, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER with Jury Demand, and COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gillette, Keith) Modified on 4/8/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 7, 2021 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0972-9527626. (THIS RECEIPT HAS BEEN REFUNDED) (Gillette, Keith) Modified on 4/9/2021 (Washington, S).
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Summons in Civil Action by Debbie Larsen, Scott Larsen re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons, #5 summons, #6 summons, #7 summons, #8 summons, #9 summons, #10 summons, #11 summons, #12 summons, #13 summons)(Sciacca, John)
March 24, 2021 RECEIPT number #CAE200112949 $123.50 fbo Scott Larsen, Debbie Larsen by Powers Miller on 3/23/2021. (Becknal, R)
March 24, 2021 RECEIPT number #CAE200112950 $1000.00 fbo Scott Larsen, Debbie Larsen by Powers Miller on 3/23/2021. (Becknal, R)
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deposit of Security for Costs by Debbie Larsen, Scott Larsen. (Sciacca, John)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE of MONITION and INJUNCTION; ISSUING NOTICE and APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION FOR VALUE signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/8/2021.(Tupolo, A)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/5/2021 re #6 Ex Parte Application for Publication of Notice. Plaintiffs are to publish the notice required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Supplemental Rule F(4) in the Sacramento Bee once a week for 4 successive weeks. (Tupolo, A)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION for PUBLICATION of NOTICE by Debbie Larsen, Scott Larsen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sciacca, John)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/4/2021 APPROVING Exoneration from, or limitation of, Liability. (Tupolo, A)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM by Debbie Larsen, Scott Larsen in Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rex Michel, #2 Ad Interim Stipulation, #3 Proposed Order)(Sciacca, John) Modified on 3/4/2021 (Reader, L).
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER and NOTICE of Complaint for Exoneration from, or Limitation of, Liability by Debbie Larsen, Scott Larsen re #1 Complaint. (Sciacca, John) Modified on 3/4/2021 (Reader, L).
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9448112) (RECEIPTS 0972-9448038 AND 0972-9448065 HAVE BEEN REFUNDED) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sciacca, John) Modified on 3/12/2021 (Washington, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larsen, et al., v. Sweet Emotion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Larsen
Represented By: Katherine L. Marlink
Represented By: John P. Sciacca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Larsen
Represented By: Katherine L. Marlink
Represented By: John P. Sciacca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweet Emotion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Elaine Ilderton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ox Bow Marina
Represented By: Lilla Shkolnikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: C. Joseph Ou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Lilla Shkolnikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith Randall Gillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: C. Joseph Ou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?