(PC)Jolivette v. California Department of Correction & Rehabilitation et al
Plaintiff: Paul Patrick Jolivette
Defendant: J. Geels and California Department of Correction & Rehabilitation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00407
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-00407 TLN CKD. (Kaminski, H)
March 31, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Paul Patrick Jolivette. (Kaminski, H)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Paul Patrick Jolivette re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (Kaminski, H)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kaminski, H)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Reader, L)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Paul Patrick Jolivette. (Reader, L)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against California Department of Correction & Rehabilitation, J. Geels by Paul Patrick Jolivette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reader, L)
March 8, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Paul Patrick Jolivette. (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Jolivette v. California Department of Correction & Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Patrick Jolivette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Geels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Correction & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?