Munson v. 1979 26 Cal Sailboat
Plaintiff: Jason Munson
Defendant: 1979 26 Cal Sailboat
Case Number: 2:2021cv00418
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL STIPULATION re #6 Order for value and costs and letter of undertaking by Jason Munson. (Fedeli, Thomas) Modified on 5/5/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/23/21 ORDERING that, pursuant to Rule F(4) of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims, not later than the date of the second publication, PLAINTIFF-IN-LIMITATION shall mail a copy of the Notice of Complaint to every person and entity known to have asserted any claim against PLAINTIFF-IN-LIMITATION, or the Vessel, arising out of, resulting from, or in any manner connected with, that which the Complaint herein seeks exoneration from, or limitation of, liability. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the publication and mailing of the Notice of Complaint described herein shall constitute due notice to all persons asserting claims arising out of or in any way relating to that which the Complaint herein seeks exoneration from, or limitation of, liability. (Kaminski, H)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/23/21 ORDERING that the institution or prosecution of any and all suits, actions or legal proceedings of any nature and description whatsoever, against PLAINTIFF- INLIMITATION or the Vessel, whether presently ongoing, filed but unknown, or to be filed in the future, except in this proceeding, with respect to any claims for injuries or damages arising out of, resulting from, or in any manner connected with, that which the Complaint in this action seeks exoneration from, or limitation of, liability be, and the same hereby are, stayed and restrained until the hearing and final determination of this proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a monition issue out of and under the seal of this court to all persons and entities asserting any claim with respect to that which the Complaint in this action seeks exoneration from, or limitation of, liability admonishing them to file their respective claims with the Clerk of this court at the United States Courthouse, in writing and under oath, and to serve a copy thereof on the attorneys for PLAINTIFF-IN- LIMITATION, or be deemed in contumacy and default; provided that any such claim shall be filed on or before the thirtieth (30th) day following the last date of publication of the Notice of Complaint to be published in the Tahoe Daily Tribune, a newspaper of general circulation published in El Dorado County, as ordered by the court in a separate order filed concurrently with this order. (Kaminski, H)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/23/21 ORDERING that the Stipulation Regarding Security for Value and Costs and the Letter of Undertaking are approved for the purposes of allowing this matter to move forward. (Kaminski, H)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/23/21 GRANTING #4 Ex Parte Motion. The court directs Mr. Munson to deposit the $1,000 security for costs and $7,270 estimated vessel value, a total of $8,270, with the Clerk of Court within seven (7) days of this order. #5 Request for hearing is denied as moot. All hearing dates are vacated. (Kaminski, H)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for HEARING #4 on Ex Parte Application by Jason Munson . (Fedeli, Thomas)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 EX PARTE APPLICATION for (1) Approval of Stipulation for Value and Costs and Letter of Undertaking; (2) Order Directing Monition to Issue and Restraining all Suits and (3) Order Directing Execution of Monition and Publication of Notice by Jason Munson . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Lodging of Foreign Authorities, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Stipulation for Value and Costs and Letter of Undertaking, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation re Security for Value and Costs and Letter of Undertaking, #9 Proposed Order Directing Monition to Issue and Restraining all Suits, #10 Proposed Order Directing Execution of Monition and Publication of Notice, #11 Proposed Notice of Complaint for Exoneration from, or Limitation of, Liability)(Fedeli, Thomas) Modified on 3/10/2021 (Benson, A.).
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jason Munson. (Fedeli, Thomas)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by Jason Munson as to 1979 26 Cal Sailboat bearing Hull Identification No. CABAO138M781, and her engines, tackle, appurtenances, etc. Attorney Fedeli, Thomas M. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9463744) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fedeli, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munson v. 1979 26 Cal Sailboat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Munson
Represented By: Thomas M. Fedeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1979 26 Cal Sailboat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?