Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh, PA v. Hull et al
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Defendant: Sarah R. Doyle, Damion N. Doyle, Holland E.T. Hines, Gethsemane Temple Church of God in Christ, American Red Cross of San Bernardino County, Barbara Hull and Kathleen D. Keenan
Case Number: 2:2021cv00481
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1002
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Sarah R. Doyle by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Klein, Elise) Modified on 4/28/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Kathleen D. Keenan by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Klein, Elise) Modified on 4/28/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and #1 Complaint Complaint signed by Barbara Hull by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Klein, Elise) Modified on 4/28/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Pastor for Gethsemane Temple Church of God in Christ by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Klein, Elise) Modified on 4/28/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Damion N. Doyle by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Klein, Elise) Modified on 4/28/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *American Red Cross of San Bernardino County, Damion N. Doyle, Sarah R. Doyle, Gethsemane Temple Church of God in Christ, Holland E.T. Hines, Barbara Hull, Kathleen D. Keenan* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Elise D. Klein* *Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP* *633 West 5th St., Suite 4000* *Los Angeles, CA 90071*. (Benson, A.)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Attorney Klein, Elise D. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9480373) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klein, Elise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh, PA v. Hull et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah R. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damion N. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland E.T. Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gethsemane Temple Church of God in Christ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Red Cross of San Bernardino County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen D. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Elise D. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?