(HC) Pulizzano v. State of California
Defendant: State of California
Petitioner: James Joseph Pulizzano
Case Number: 2:2021cv00503
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin, Senior Assistant Attorney General. (Henshaw, R)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/6/2021. Consent or Decline due by 5/10/2021. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Senior Assistant Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/6/2021 DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Senior Assistant Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
April 6, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on James Joseph Pulizzano. (Henshaw, R)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-00503 WBS CKD (HC). (Becknal, R)
April 5, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on James Joseph Pulizzano. (Becknal, R)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Becknal, R)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Rodriguez, E)
March 22, 2021 RECEIPT number #CAE200112865 $5.00 by James Joseph Pulizzano on 3/22/2021. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 22, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on James Joseph Pulizzano. (Rodriguez, E)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against State of California by James Joseph Pulizzano.(Rodriguez, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Pulizzano v. State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Joseph Pulizzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?