(PC) Adkins v. Hurtado
Plaintiff: DuPree Lamont Adkins
Defendant: D. Hurtado
Case Number: 2:2021cv00531
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #2 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Dupree Lamont Adkins signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/22/21. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
April 23, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, served on DuPree Lamont Adkins. (Plummer, M)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 04/21/21 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Within 60 days from the service of this order, plaintiff must either file an Amended Complaint or advise the court he wishes stand by his current complaint. The clerks office is directed to send plaintiff a complaint form. (Plummer, M)
April 22, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, and prisoner complaint form served on DuPree Lamont Adkins. (Plummer, M)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by DuPree Lamont Adkins (Rodriguez, E)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for DuPree Lamont Adkins, CDC K-50645 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *3/23/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 4/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Rodriguez, E)
March 24, 2021 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on DuPree Lamont Adkins. (Rodriguez, E)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by DuPree Lamont Adkins. (Rodriguez, E)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against D. Hurtado by DuPree Lamont Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Adkins v. Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DuPree Lamont Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?