General Teamsters Local 439 et al., v. Leprino Foods Company
Petitioner: General Teamsters Local 439
Respondent: Leprino Foods Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00563
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
2 Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY by General Teamsters Local 439 to RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Compel. (Crowley, Alan)
May 19, 2021 Filing 15 EX PARTE APPLICATION by General Teamsters Local 439 to continue the hearing date and briefing schedule re #12 motion for sanctions. (Crowley, Alan) Modified on 5/21/2021 (Zignago, K.).
May 14, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 6/10/2021 hearing on the Motion for Sanctions #12 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
May 13, 2021 Filing 13 OPPOSITION by Leprino Foods Company to #6 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sandra L. Rappaport, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed] Order)(Kourafas, Adrianna)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for SANCTIONS by Leprino Foods Company. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Sandra L. Rappaport, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order)(Kourafas, Adrianna) Modified on 5/14/2021 (Kastilahn, A).
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Leprino Foods Company. (Kourafas, Adrianna)
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Compel Arbitration #6 is RESET for hearing on 5/27/2021. Pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 5/27/2021 hearing is VACATED and SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the 5/27/2021 motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/14/2021 REASSIGNING Case 2:21-cv-00563-WBS-CKD to Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. The New Case Number is: 21-cv-00563-MCE-CKD. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of ALAN G. CROWLEY in support of #6 Motion to Compel. (Crowley, Alan)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by General Teamsters Local 439 in SUPPORT of #6 Motion to Compel. (Crowley, Alan)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to COMPEL ARBITRATION by General Teamsters Local 439. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Crowley, Alan)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Leprino Foods Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Kourafas, Adrianna)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:18-CV-00280-MCE-CKD by Leprino Foods Company. (Kourafas, Adrianna)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Respondent Leprino Foods Company. (Kourafas, Adrianna)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UCP-2021-0001922 by Leprino Foods Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9504716) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kourafas, Adrianna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Teamsters Local 439 et al., v. Leprino Foods Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leprino Foods Company
Represented By: Adrianna C. Kourafas
Represented By: Sandra L. Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: General Teamsters Local 439
Represented By: Alan G. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?