USA v. The Greenville Rancheria of Maidu Indians of CA
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The Greenville Rancheria of Maidu Indians of California
Case Number: 2:2021cv00662
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by The Greenville Rancheria of Maidu Indians of California. Attorney Wilgus, David Scott added.(Wilgus, David)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to The Greenville Rancheria of Maidu Indians of California on 4/14/2021, Answer due 6/14/2021 (Tennyson, Steven)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *The Greenville Rancheria of Maidu Indians of California* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Steven Tennyson* *U.S. Attorney's Office* *501 I Street, Suite 10-100* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Benson, A.)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Greenville Rancheria of Maidu Indians of California by United States of America. Attorney Tennyson, Steven added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tennyson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. The Greenville Rancheria of Maidu Indians of CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Greenville Rancheria of Maidu Indians of California
Represented By: David Scott Wilgus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Steven Tennyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?