Wells Sweeping, LLC et al v. Capital One, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Wells Sweeping, LLC and Jay Wells
Defendant: Roxy Ashcroft, Aaron Ashcroft, Capital One, National Association, Aaron Ashcraft and Roxy Ashcraft
Case Number: 2:2021cv00728
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Capital One, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint)(Tcheng, Connie)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME to respond to #1 Complaint by Capital One, National Association. Attorney Tcheng, Connie Y. added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Tcheng, Connie) Modified on 5/27/2021 (Coll, A).
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Aaron Ashcraft, Roxy Ashcraft* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin P. Cleveland* *Young, Cohen & Durrett, LLP* *1321 Howe Avenue, Suite 100* *Sacramento, CA 95825*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jay Wells, Wells Sweeping, LLC.(Cleveland, Kevin)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jay Wells, Wells Sweeping, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice of Correction (name of Defendants))(Cleveland, Kevin)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Aaron Ashcroft, Roxy Ashcroft, Capital One, National Association * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin P. Cleveland* *Young, Cohen & Durrett, LLP* *1321 Howe Ave., Suite 100* *95825*. (Tupolo, A)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jay Wells, Wells Sweeping, LLC. Attorney Cleveland, Kevin added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9561666) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cleveland, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Sweeping, LLC et al v. Capital One, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxy Ashcroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Ashcroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, National Association
Represented By: Connie Y. Tcheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Ashcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxy Ashcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Sweeping, LLC
Represented By: Kevin P. Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Wells
Represented By: Kevin P. Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?