Crowley et al v. Faison et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Crowley, Crowley Properties and Karra Crowley
Defendant: Black Lives Matter Sacramento and Tanya Danielle Faison
Case Number: 2:2021cv00778
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY by Black Lives Matter Sacramento, Tanya Danielle Faison to RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss.(Merin, Mark)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY by Black Lives Matter Sacramento, Tanya Danielle Faison to RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Strike. (Merin, Mark)
June 8, 2021 Filing 11 OPPOSITION by Karra Crowley to #7 Motion to Strike. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit)(Ochrach, Jeffrey)
June 8, 2021 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Karra Crowley to #8 Motion to Dismiss. (Ochrach, Jeffrey)
June 1, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 6/24/2021 hearing on the Motion to Strike #7 and Motion to Dismiss #8 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by Black Lives Matter Sacramento, Tanya Danielle Faison. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Mark E. Merin, #3 Proposed Order)(Merin, Mark)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to STRIKE #1 Complaint by Black Lives Matter Sacramento, Tanya Danielle Faison. Attorney Merin, Mark E. added. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Mark E. Merin, #3 Proposed Order)(Merin, Mark) Modified on 5/21/2021 (Zignago, K.).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR EARLY THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 5/12/21. (Kastilahn, A)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the Stipulation and Proposed Order for Early Third Party Discovery (ECF No. 4). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rules 101 and 131(c), the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Early Third Party Discovery by Karra Crowley. (Ochrach, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/10/2021 (Kastilahn, A).
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Black Lives Matter Sacramento, Tanya Danielle Faison* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey H. Ochrach* *Ochrach Law Group* *5701 Lonetree Blvd., Suite 213* *Rocklin, CA 95765*. (Benson, A.)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Karra Crowley. Attorney Ochrach, Jeffrey H. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9576121) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ochrach, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crowley et al v. Faison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matter Sacramento
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Danielle Faison
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Crowley
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Ochrach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crowley Properties
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Ochrach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karra Crowley
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Ochrach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?