Doutherd v. United Parcel Service Freight et al
Plaintiff: Tyrone Doutherd
Defendant: Shaquita Andrews, United Parcel Service Freight, United Parcel Service, Inc., Sara Cutshaw, Reid Roy, James Anderson and Gabriela Estrada
Case Number: 2:2021cv00780
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
2 Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
3 Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Sara Cutshaw, Reid Roy, United Parcel Service Freight, United Parcel Service, Inc. re #13 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Vicente, Emily)
June 3, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #6 , #9 Motion to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Vicente, Emily) Modified on 6/4/2021 (Tupolo, A).
June 1, 2021 Filing 14 OPPOSITION by Tyrone Doutherd to #9 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Dove, Ellen)
May 26, 2021 Filing 13 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/25/21 ORDERING that 2:21-cv-00780 is REASSIGNED from Senior District Judge William B. Shubb to the undersigned and from Magistrate Judge Allison Claire to Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as: 2:21-cv-00780 -KJM-JDP. (Kastilahn, A)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 OBJECTIONS to removal to federal court and related case designation by Tyrone Doutherd. (Dove, Ellen) Modified on 5/20/2021 (Reader, L).
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by United Parcel Service Freight, United Parcel Service, Inc. re #9 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Vicente, Emily) Modified on 5/14/2021 (Reader, L).
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS by United Parcel Service Freight, United Parcel Service, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emily Burkhardt Vicente, #2 Declaration of Quantis Hall, #3 Declaration of Bryan Brum)(Vicente, Emily) Modified on 5/14/2021 (Reader, L).
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants United Parcel Service Freight, United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Vicente, Emily)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED #2 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:17-cv-02225 KJM-JDP by Sara Cutshaw, Reid Roy, United Parcel Service Freight, United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Vicente, Emily)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Sara Cutshaw, Reid Roy. Motion Hearing SET for 6/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Vicente, Emily) Modified on 5/11/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Sara Cutshaw, Reid Roy, United Parcel Service Freight, United Parcel Service, Inc. re #4 Civil New Case Documents for WBS, #3 Notice of Interested Parties, #2 Notice of Related Case(s), #1 Notice of Removal,. (Vicente, Emily)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sara Cutshaw, Reid Roy, United Parcel Service Freight, United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Vicente, Emily)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:17-cv-02225 KJM-JDP by Sara Cutshaw, Reid Roy, United Parcel Service Freight, United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Vicente, Emily)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Yolo County Superior Court case number CV2021-0297 by UPS Freight, UPS, Cutshaw and Roy. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9576149) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emily Burkhardt Vicente), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vicente, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doutherd v. United Parcel Service Freight et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaquita Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Freight
Represented By: Emily Burkhardt Vicente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Burkhardt Vicente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Cutshaw
Represented By: Emily Burkhardt Vicente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reid Roy
Represented By: Emily Burkhardt Vicente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriela Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Doutherd
Represented By: Ellen Carol Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?