Klinker et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Klinker and David Klinker
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2021cv00817
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Wes, Joshua)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson.(Wes, Joshua)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc..(Wes, Joshua)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME to respond to #1 Complaint by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Attorney Wes, Joshua James added. (Wes, Joshua) Modified on 5/17/2021 (Coll, A).
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Wendy A. Mitchell* *Napoli Shkolnik PLLC* *400 Continental Blvd., 6th Floor* *El Segundo, CA 90245*. (Benson, A.)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Michelle Klinker, David Klinker. Attorney Mitchell, Wendy Aline added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9581170) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Wendy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klinker et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Klinker
Represented By: Wendy A. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Klinker
Represented By: Wendy A. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua James Wes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Joshua James Wes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?