(PC) Smith v. Shasta County Jail et al
Plaintiff: James Edward Smith
Defendant: Dave Kent, Van Gerwin, Shasta County Jail, Vhorez, El Monte Law Group, Shasta County D.A. Office, Well Path, Shasta County Sheriff's Dept., California Forensic Medical Group and Shasta County Superior Court
Case Number: 2:2021cv00877
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS to Wasco State Prison (CDCR No. BN-9114), P.O. Box 5500, Wasco, CA 93280 by James Edward Smith and REQUEST for court to serve #9 Opposition. (Benson, A.) (Response sent - The court will screen the complaint in due course. If the court finds that service is appropriate in this matter it will issue an order for service of the summons and complaint.) Modified on 6/23/2021 (Yin, K).
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to "Motion to Reconsider" in former case no. 2:20-cv-1837-KJM-DMC by Plaintiff James Edward Smith. (Benson, A.) Modified on 6/23/2021 (Yin, K).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT by James Edward Smith. (Coll, A) Modified on 6/15/2021 (Yin, K).
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Tupolo, A)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST for DOCUMENTS filed in associated case 2:20-cv-01837-KJM-DMC to be considered filed and served in case 2:21-cv-00877-CKD by James Edward Smith. (Tupolo, A) Modified on 6/8/2021 (Plummer, M).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Tupolo, A)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/20/2021 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint and the certification on the application form. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Henshaw, R)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP application served on James Edward Smith. (Henshaw, R)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Tupolo, A)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on James Edward Smith. (Tupolo, A)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Edward Smith. (Tupolo, A)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by James Edward Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Smith v. Shasta County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Gerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vhorez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Monte Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta County D.A. Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Well Path
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta County Sheriff's Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?