(HC) Craig v. D'Agostini, et al.,
Petitioner: Norman Craig and Norman John Craig
Respondent: John D'Agostini and Vern Pierson
Case Number: 2:2021cv00890
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT by Norman John Craig re #10 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Reader, L)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS by Norman John Craig.(Coll, A)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Joinder by Norman John Craig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Reader, L)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT by Norman John Craig re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Reader, L)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 6/2/2021 ORDERING Clerk to assign a district judge to rule on these findings and recommendations and RECOMMENDING #3 Motion to Convert be granted and if this recommendation is adopted, the Clerk of Court should be ordered to send petitioner a section 1983 complaint form and the appropriate application to proceed in forma pauperis and Petitioner should be given 60 days to file his complaint and either pay the filing fee or submit a completed IFP application and #5 Motion to Consolidate should be denied. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days of the service of the findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-0890 JAM JDP (HC). (Henshaw, R)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Norman John Craig. (Henshaw, R)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE PETITIONS by Norman John Craig. (Kastilahn, A)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION TO CONVERT to a 42 U.S.C. 1983 by Norman John Craig. (Kastilahn, A)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Zignago, K.)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Norman Craig. (Zignago, K.)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against John D'Agostini by Norman Craig. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Craig v. D'Agostini, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norman Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norman John Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John D'Agostini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vern Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?