Lo et al v. County of Siskiyou et al
Plaintiff: Dilevon Lo, Pao Lee, Nathan Thao, Jerry Vang, Mao Thao, Antonio Lee, Koua Lee, Nhia Thai Vang, Zeng Lee, Der Lee and Khue Cha
Defendant: Jeremiah LaRue, Brandon Criss, Jesus Fernandez, Ed Valenzuela, Nancy Ogren, Edward Kiernan, County of Siskiyou, Michael Kobseff, Ray Haupt and California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection
Case Number: 2:2021cv00999
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 32 AMENDED OBJECTIONS by County of Siskiyou, Brandon Criss, Edward Kiernan, Michael Kobseff, Jeremiah LaRue, Nancy Ogren, Ed Valenzuela to #31 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Khue Cha affidavit of 6-11-21, #2 Koua Lee affidavit of 6.11.21, #3 Nhia Thai Vang affidavit of 6.11.21, #4 Nhia Thai Vang affidavit of 7.6.21, #5 Szendrey affidavit of 6.3.21, #6 Szendrey supp affidavit of 6.11.21, #7 Szendrey supp affidavit of 7.14.21, #8 Zeng Lee affidavit of 7.6.21)(Donald, J.) Modified on 7/30/2021 (Reader, L).
July 28, 2021 Filing 31 [DISREGARD SEE [ #32 ]OPPOSITION by County of Siskiyou, Brandon Criss, Jesus Fernandez, Ray Haupt, Edward Kiernan, Michael Kobseff, Jeremiah LaRue, Nancy Ogren, Ed Valenzuela to #4 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donna Hamilton, #2 Declaration of Jeremiah LaRue, #3 Declaration of Craig Kay, #4 Declaration of Bryan Schenone, #5 Declaration of Kirk Skierski, #6 Declaration of J. Scott Donald, #7 Objection to Der Lee, #8 Objection to Khue Cha, #9 Objection to Koua Lee, #10 Objection to Nhia Thai Vang, dated 6.11.21, #11 Objection to Nhia Thai Vang, dated 7.6.21, #12 Objection to Szendrey, dated 6.3.21, #13 Objection to Szendrey, dated 6.11.21, #14 Objection to Szendrey, dated 7.14.21, #15 Objection to Zeng Lee Vang)(Donald, J.) Modified on 7/29/2021 (Reader, L). Modified on 7/29/2021 (Reader, L).
July 26, 2021 Filing 30 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Allison B. Margolin* *Margolin & Lawrence* *8484 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 440* *Beverly Hills, California 90211*. (Reader, L)
July 15, 2021 Filing 29 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Antonio Lee, Nathan Thao, Jerry Vang, Dilevon Lo, Mao Thao, Pao Lee.(Margolin, Allison)
July 15, 2021 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Edward Szendrey re #21 Supplement to Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Antonio Lee, Pao Lee, Dilevon Lo, Mao Thao, Nathan Thao, Jerry Vang. (Margolin, Allison) Modified on 7/26/2021 (Reader, L).
July 15, 2021 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Zeng Lee re #21 Supplement to Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Antonio Lee, Pao Lee, Dilevon Lo, Mao Thao, Nathan Thao, Jerry Vang. (Margolin, Allison) Modified on 7/26/2021 (Reader, L).
July 15, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Nhia Thai Vang re #21 Supplement to Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Antonio Lee, Pao Lee, Dilevon Lo, Mao Thao, Nathan Thao, Jerry Vang. (Margolin, Allison) Modified on 7/26/2021 (Reader, L).
July 15, 2021 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Khue Cha re #21 Supplement to Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Antonio Lee, Pao Lee, Dilevon Lo, Mao Thao, Nathan Thao, Jerry Vang. (Margolin, Allison) Modified on 7/26/2021 (Reader, L).
July 15, 2021 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Koua Lee re #21 Supplement to Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Antonio Lee, Pao Lee, Dilevon Lo, Mao Thao, Nathan Thao, Jerry Vang. (Margolin, Allison) Modified on 7/26/2021 (Reader, L).
July 15, 2021 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Der Lee re #21 Supplement to Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Antonio Lee, Pao Lee, Dilevon Lo, Mao Thao, Nathan Thao, Jerry Vang. (Margolin, Allison) Modified on 7/26/2021 (Reader, L).
July 15, 2021 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Chris Conrad re #21 Supplement. (Margolin, Allison)
July 15, 2021 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENT by Antonio Lee, Pao Lee, Dilevon Lo, Mao Thao, Nathan Thao, Jerry Vang re #4 Motion for Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #17 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Margolin, Allison) Modified on 7/26/2021 (Reader, L).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/8/2021 MOTION HEARING #4 re Motion for Preliminary Injunction RESET for 8/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller.(Reader, L)
July 7, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Allow Filing of First Amended Complaint by Antonio Lee, Pao Lee, Dilevon Lo, Mao Thao, Nathan Thao, Jerry Vang. (Margolin, Allison)
July 1, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/1/2021: The Request to Continue, ECF No. #15 , which the court construes as an Ex Parte Application to Continue, is GRANTED for good cause shown. The dates and deadlines set in the court's Order at ECF No. #11 are VACATED. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a schedule for briefing and hearing Plaintiffs' Request for Injunctive Relief and Proposal to Amend the Complaint. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
June 30, 2021 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #4 , filed by Antonio Lee, Pao Lee, Dilevon Lo, Mao Thao, Nathan Thao, and Jerry Vang (Margolin, Allison) (Docket Text Modified on 7/1/2021 by C. Schultz)
June 29, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Counsel J. Raza Lawrence in SUPPORT of #15 Motion to Continue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Margolin, Allison) Modified on 7/6/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 29, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST to CONTINUE Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Antonio Lee, Pao Lee, Dilevon Lo, Mao Thao, Nathan Thao, and Jerry Vang. (Margolin, Allison) (Docket Text Modified on 7/1/2021 by C. Schultz)
June 21, 2021 Filing 14 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY J. Scott Donald for defendants. (Donald, J.) Modified on 6/22/2021 (Kastilahn, A).
June 18, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by All Defendants. Attorney Donald, J. Scott added. (Donald, J.)
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Pine for Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/16/2021: This matter is set for an Initial Scheduling Conference on 10/20/2021 at 11:00 AM in Redding before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this minute order on Defendants not yet appearing.(Pine, C)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/15/2021 DENYING #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. A Preliminary Injunction hearing is SET for 7/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The hearing will be by videoconference. Plaintiffs may file a brief in support of their Request for Injunctive Relief by 6/30/2021. Defendants response by 7/14/2021, and any, reply by 7/21/2021.(Reader, L)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy L. Kennison for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller ORDERING this matter REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for pretrial scheduling. Accordingly, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 10/14/2021 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED, and will be reset by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this minute order on Defendants not yet appearing. (Text Only Entry)(Kennison, L)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY by Plaintiffs re #7 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Affidavit of Nathan Thao, #2 Affidavit of Boua Hue Vue, #3 Affidavit of Mao Thao, #4 Affidavit of Jerry Vang, #5 Affidavit of Nhia Thai Vang, #6 Affidavit of Antonio Lee, #7 Affidavit of Mai Yang Lee, #8 Affidavit of Koua Lee, #9 Affidavit of Pao Lee, #10 Affidavit of Khue Cha, #11 Affidavit of Stephen Griset, #12 Exhibit A)(Margolin, Allison) Modified on 6/15/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER from J. Scott Donald by Defendant County of Siskiyou re #4 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rick Dean)(Spinelli, Domenic) Modified on 6/10/2021 (Kaminski, H).
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 OPPOSITION by County of Siskiyou to #4 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Attorney Spinelli, Domenic D. added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Carroll)(Spinelli, Domenic) Modified on 6/10/2021 (Kaminski, H).
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION OF COUNSEL re 5 MINUTE ORDER by All Plaintiffs. (Margolin, Allison) Modified on 6/8/2021 (Kaminski, H).
June 7, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/7/2021: The court has carefully reviewed Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. #4 , and supporting Declarations, and finds Plaintiffs have not on this record established they are entitled to a temporary restraining order without the court's providing Defendants an opportunity to respond. Additionally, the court discerns no immediate harm to Plaintiffs in the next several days if the court sets the time for full briefing on an expedited basis. Accordingly, Defendants are provided until 4:00 p.m. on Wednesday, 6/9/2021, to file an opposition, and Plaintiffs may then file a reply by 4:00 PM on Friday, 6/11/221, at which time the matter will be submitted unless the court determines a hearing is necessary. Plaintiffs shall promptly notify Defendants of this Minute Order and briefing schedule, and file proof of such notice on the court's docket. SO ORDERED. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 TRO Checklist, #2 Notice and Declaration of Counsel, #3 Proposed Order #4 Affidavit of Plaintiff or Witness, #5 Affidavit of Plaintiff or Witness, #6 Affidavit of Plaintiff or Witness, #7 Affidavit of Plaintiff or Witness, #8 Affidavit of Plaintiff or Witness, #9 Affidavit of Plaintiff or Witness, #10 Affidavit of Plaintiff or Witness, #11 Affidavit of Plaintiff or Witness, #12 Affidavit of Plaintiff or Witness, #13 Affidavit of Plaintiff or Witness, #14 Affidavit of Plaintiff or Witness, #15 Affidavit of Plaintiff or Witness)(Margolin, Allison) (Docket Text Modified on 6/4/2021 by C. Schultz)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Siskiyou, Brandon Criss, Jesus Fernandez, Ray Haupt, Edward Kiernan, Michael Kobseff, Jeremiah LaRue, Nancy Ogren, Ed Valenzuela* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Allison B. Margolin* *Margolin & Lawrence Attorneys at Law* *8484 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 440* *Beverly Hills, CA 90211*. (Benson, A.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. Attorney Margolin, Allison B. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9637137) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Margolin, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lo et al v. County of Siskiyou et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah LaRue
Represented By: J. Scott Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Criss
Represented By: J. Scott Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Fernandez
Represented By: J. Scott Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Valenzuela
Represented By: J. Scott Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Ogren
Represented By: J. Scott Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Kiernan
Represented By: J. Scott Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Siskiyou
Represented By: Domenic D. Spinelli
Represented By: J. Scott Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kobseff
Represented By: J. Scott Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Haupt
Represented By: J. Scott Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dilevon Lo
Represented By: Allison B. Margolin
Represented By: James Raza Lawrence
Represented By: Jennie W. Stepanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pao Lee
Represented By: Allison B. Margolin
Represented By: James Raza Lawrence
Represented By: Jennie W. Stepanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Thao
Represented By: Allison B. Margolin
Represented By: James Raza Lawrence
Represented By: Jennie W. Stepanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Vang
Represented By: Allison B. Margolin
Represented By: Jennie W. Stepanian
Represented By: James Raza Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mao Thao
Represented By: Allison B. Margolin
Represented By: James Raza Lawrence
Represented By: Jennie W. Stepanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Lee
Represented By: Allison B. Margolin
Represented By: James Raza Lawrence
Represented By: Jennie W. Stepanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koua Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nhia Thai Vang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeng Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Der Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khue Cha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?