(PS) Vodonick v. Federal National Mortgage Assoc., Inc.
Plaintiff: John Vodonick
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01008
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
2 Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
3 Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Stoltzman, Jr., Michael)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Zignago, K.)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: On April 23, 2021, Plaintiff, John Vodonick, filed a Complaint in the Superior Court of California for the County of Nevada, appearing pro se. See ECF No. #1 . On June 7, 2021, Defendant, Federal National Mortgage Association, removed the action. Id. This matter is REFERRED to the assigned magistrate judge for all further proceedings. See E.D. Cal. L.R. 302(c)(21). Any pending deadlines and hearings set before District Judge John A. Mendez are VACATED. The parties shall take note that all documents hereafter filed with the Clerk of the Court shall bear case number: 2:21-cv-01008 JAM EFB (PS). IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/8/2021 ORDERING cases 2:15-CV-00539 JAM-EFB and 2:21-CV-01008 KJM-JDP are RELATED. Action denominated 2:21-CV-01008 KJM-JDP is reassigned to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:21-CV-01008 JAM-EFB. (Zignago, K.)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER by Federal National Mortgage Association, Inc..(Stoltzman, Jr., Michael)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of ORDER SETTING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE by Federal National Mortgage Association, Inc. re #3 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Stoltzman, Jr., Michael) Modified on 6/9/2021 (Kaminski, H).
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) CV-00539-JAM-EFB by Federal National Mortgage Association, Inc.. (Stoltzman, Jr., Michael)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Federal National Mortgage Association, Inc., (Stoltzman, Jr., Michael)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Nevada County Superior Court, case number CU21- 085394 by Federal National Mortgage Association, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9640121) (Stoltzman, Jr., Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Vodonick v. Federal National Mortgage Assoc., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Stoltzman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vodonick
Represented By: E. John Vodonick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?