Ramirez et al v. Cornerstone Building Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ana Rosa Mendoza, Alicia Fernandez, Esmeralda Lizbeth Mendez Lozano, Claudia Ramirez, Rosa Hernandez, Dulce Nieto and Lilian Cabrera
Defendant: Simonton Windows & Doors, Inc., Ply Gem Pacific Windows Corporation, Ply Gem Windows, Cornerstone Building Brands, Inc. and Ply Gem Residential Solutions
Case Number: 2:2021cv01017
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT STATEMENT of Class Action Pursuant to Pretrial Order filed by Defendants Cornerstone Building Brands, Inc., Ply Gem Pacific Windows Corporation, Ply Gem Residential Solutions, Ply Gem Windows, Simonton Windows & Doors, Inc. re 9 Minute Order,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,, Motions Submitted/Under Advisement,,, Order on Motion to Remand,,. Attorney Bern, Martin D added. (Bern, Martin)
August 5, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY by Lilian Cabrera, Alicia Fernandez, et al., re #8 Motion to Remand. (Boyadjian, Aram) Modified on 8/6/2021 (Kastilahn, A).
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 OPPOSITION to #8 Motion to Remand by Cornerstone Building Brands, Inc., Ply Gem Pacific Windows Corporation, Simonton Windows & Doors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Shannon Anderson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order)(Moreshead, David) Modified on 7/30/2021 (Huang, H).
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 8/12/2021 hearing on the Motion to Remand #8 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to REMAND by Lilian Cabrera et al. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aram Boyadjian, #2 Proposed Order)(Boyadjian, Aram) Modified on 7/9/2021 (Coll, A).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/29/2021 EXTENDING Plaintiffs' deadline to file Motion to Strike.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Continue Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Motion to Strike by Lilian Cabrera, et al. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Boyadjian, Aram) Modified on 6/28/2021 (Tupolo, A).
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT(S) ELECTRONICALLY by Cornerstone Building Brands, Inc., Ply Gem Pacific Windows Corporation, Simonton Windows & Doors, Inc.: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in Superior Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal to United States District Court, Eastern District of California)(Moreshead, David)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Aram Boyadjian on behalf of Lilian Cabrera, Alicia Fernandez, Rosa Hernandez, Esmeralda Lizbeth Mendez Lozano, Ana Rosa Mendoza, Dulce Nieto, Claudia Ramirez. Attorney Boyadjian, Aram added. (Boyadjian, Aram)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Cornerstone Building Brands, Inc., Ply Gem Pacific Windows Corporation, Simonton Windows & Doors, Inc. re #2 Civil New Case Documents for MCE, #1 Notice of Removal. (Moreshead, David)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2021-00298527 by Cornerstone Building Brands, Inc., Ply Gem Pacific Windows Corporation and Simonton Windows & Doors, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9643136) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shannon Anderson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B , #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moreshead, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez et al v. Cornerstone Building Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Rosa Mendoza
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Aram Boyadjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Fernandez
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Aram Boyadjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esmeralda Lizbeth Mendez Lozano
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Aram Boyadjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Ramirez
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Aram Boyadjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Hernandez
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Aram Boyadjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dulce Nieto
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Aram Boyadjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilian Cabrera
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Aram Boyadjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simonton Windows & Doors, Inc.
Represented By: David W. Moreshead
Represented By: Martin D Bern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ply Gem Pacific Windows Corporation
Represented By: David W. Moreshead
Represented By: Martin D Bern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ply Gem Windows
Represented By: Martin D Bern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Building Brands, Inc.
Represented By: David W. Moreshead
Represented By: Martin D Bern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ply Gem Residential Solutions
Represented By: Martin D Bern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?