(PS) Ferreira da Silva v. Ross et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Ferreira da Silva
Defendant: Jonathan Kevin Ross, Esquire, Trail Attorney, Department of Homeland Security, ICE, Heidi C. Morgan and Sheriff Department
Case Number: 2:2021cv01208
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/1/21 DENYING #6 , #9 Motions to Appoint Counsel and GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time of 30 days from the date of this order in which to file an amended complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to re-serve plaintiff by mail with a copy of the court's order signed August 18, 2021 #8 . (Kaminski, H)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order, #10 Order, served on Alexandra Ferreira da Silva. (Kaminski, H)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order re-served on Alexandra Ferreira da Silva at the updated mailing address. (Kastilahn, A)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME and MOTION for APPOINTMENT of COUNSEL by Alexandra Ferreira da Silva. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/18/2021 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DENYING #4 Request to File Electronically; DENYING #5 Motion for Hearing and DISMISSING #1 Complaint. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. (Rodriguez, E)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Alexandra Ferreira da Silva. (Rodriguez, E)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPENDIX by Alexandra Ferreira da Silva re #1 Complaint filed by Alexandra Ferreira da Silva. (Kaminski, H)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Alexandra Ferreira da Silva. (Kastilahn, A)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION (Petition) for hearing and to have the previously Petition granted. by Alexandra Ferreira da Silva. (Reader, L)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST for Electronic Filing by Alexandra Ferreira da Silva. (Rodriguez, E)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to STAY off Removal Procedure by Alexandra Ferreira da Silva. (Rodriguez, E)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Alexandra Ferreira da Silva. (Rodriguez, E)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, Esquire, ICE, Heidi C. Morgan, Jonathan Kevin Ross, Sheriff Department, Trail Attorney by Alexandra Ferreira da Silva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Ferreira da Silva v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Ferreira da Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Kevin Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trail Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi C. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?