(PC) Spearman v. Department of State Hospitals
Plaintiff: Reginald E. Spearman and Reginald Edward Spearman
Defendant: Department of State Hospitals and Department of Developmental Services
Case Number: 2:2021cv01213
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OBJECTIONS to #5 Findings and Recommendations by Plaintiff Reginald Edward Spearman. (Coll, A)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Reginald Edward Spearman. (Becknal, R) Modified on 8/31/2021 (Plummer, M).
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order,, Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Reginald Edward Spearman. (Plummer, M)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/25/2021 DIRECTING the Clerk to randomly assign a District Judge to this case. District Judge Troy L. Nunley added. It is hereby RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations. (Tupolo, A)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and IFP form served on Reginald Edward Spearman. (Rodriguez, E)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/16/2021 DIRECTING plaintiff to file a Motion for IFP or pay the filing fee within 30 days from the date of this order. (Rodriguez, E)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Becknal, R)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Reginald E. Spearman. (Becknal, R)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Department of State Hospitals by Reginald E. Spearman.(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Spearman v. Department of State Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald E. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Edward Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Developmental Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?