Del Rosario v. Yakte Properties, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Imelda Del Rosario
Defendant: Yakte Properties LLC and Clear Recon Corp
Case Number: 2:2021cv01304
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/8/2021 GRANTING #5 Motion to Dismiss, and any Amended Complaint must be filed within 30 days. Initial Scheduling Conference Reset for 10/28/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Reader, L)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/6/2021: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 12/2/2021 is ADVANCED to 9/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Minute Order on Defendant not yet appearing. The September Hearing will proceed by video conferencing through the Zoom application. The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with the hearing access information no less than 24 hours before the hearing. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Yakte Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-HH)(Benbow, Jillian)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Yakte Properties LLC in SUPPORT of #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Benbow, Jillian)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS by Yakte Properties LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Benbow, Jillian)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Yakte Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order Setting Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference, #2 Order, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent in civil cases, #4 Notice of Availability)(Benbow, Jillian) Modified on 7/27/2021 (Reader, L).
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Yakte Properties LLC (Benbow, Jillian)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Placer County Superior Court, case number S-CV-0046933 by Yakte Properties LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9728392) (Benbow, Jillian).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Rosario v. Yakte Properties, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imelda Del Rosario
Represented By: Timothy G. McFarlin
Represented By: Timothy McFarlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yakte Properties LLC
Represented By: Jillian A. Benbow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?