Palazzi v. Avrit, Jr.
Plaintiff: Rachel Palazzi
Defendant: Bruce Randy Avrit, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01336
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Bruce Randy Avrit, Jr. on 8/2/2021, Answer due 10/1/2021 (Watson, Joshua)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Zignago, K.)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Bruce Randy Avrit, Jr.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joshua H. Watson* *Clayeo C. Arnold, APC* *865 Howe Avenue* *Sacramento, CA 95825*. (Zignago, K.)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bruce Randy Avrit, Jr. by Rachel Palazzi. Attorney Watson, Joshua H. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9736812) (Attachments: #1 Exh 1 - Administrative Complaints (LWDA and DFEH), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watson, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palazzi v. Avrit, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Palazzi
Represented By: Joshua H. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Randy Avrit, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?