Sun Riser, LLC v. Lurch Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sun Riser, LLC
Defendant: Lurch Logistics, LLC and Laszlo Almasi
Case Number: 2:2021cv01407
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Laszlo Almasi, Lurch Logistics, LLC* (Zignago, K.)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Laszlo Almasi, Lurch Logistics, LLC by Sun Riser, LLC. (Chappars, Mike) Modified on 9/16/2021 (Zignago, K.).
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT DECLINED as to Laszlo Almasi, Lurch Logistics, LLC. The clerk hereby declines to enter #6 Request for Entry of Default filed by Sun Riser, LLC due to insufficient service information. Summons return does not specify agent for service or person served. (TEXT ONLY) (Zignago, K.)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Laszlo Almasi, Lurch Logistics, LLC by Sun Riser, LLC. (Chappars, Mike) Modified on 9/15/2021 (Zignago, K.).
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Laszlo Almasi served on 8/14/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Chappars, Mike)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Lurch Logistics, LLC served on 8/14/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Chappars, Mike)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Laszlo Almasi, Lurch Logistics, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mike Chappars* *Law Office of Mike Chappars* *1416 Clovis Ave., Suite 206* *Clovis, CA 93612*. (Tupolo, A)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sun Riser, LLC. Attorney Chappars, Mike added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9751895) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Chappars, Mike)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Riser, LLC v. Lurch Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Riser, LLC
Represented By: Mike Chappars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lurch Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laszlo Almasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?