Smith v. G & B Grocers
Plaintiff: Maurshae Smith
Defendant: G & B Grocers California Corporation Doing business as Grocery Outlet
Case Number: 2:2021cv01504
Filed: August 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to All Defendants (Nunes, Anthony)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *G & B Grocers* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony James Nunes* *Nunes Worker Rights Law* *15260 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1200* *Sherman Oaks, CA 91403*. (Kaminski, H)
August 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Maurshae Smith (Nunes, Anthony) Modified on 8/23/2021 (Kaminski, H).
August 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G & B Grocers by Maurshae Smith Attorney Nunes, Anthony James added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9776528) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nunes, Anthony) Modified on 8/23/2021 (Kaminski, H).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. G & B Grocers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurshae Smith
Represented By: Anthony James Nunes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & B Grocers California Corporation Doing business as Grocery Outlet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?