Gas Transmission Northwest LLC et al v. Cochrane Extraction Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Gas Transmission Northwest LLC and Tuscarora Gas Transmission Company
Defendant: Cochrane Extraction Partnership, Cochrane Extraction Plant Ltd., Inter Pipeline Extraction Ltd. and Inter Pipeline Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01513
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS RE-ISSUED as to *Cochrane Extraction Partnership, Cochrane Extraction Plant Ltd., Inter Pipeline Extraction Ltd., Inter Pipeline Ltd.* with answer to complaint due within *90* days. Attorney *Anthony Q. Le* *McGuireWoods, LLP* *Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1300* *San Francisco, CA 94111*. (Huang, H)
September 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Anthony Q. Le on behalf of Gas Transmission Northwest LLC, Tuscarora Gas Transmission Company. Attorney Le, Anthony Q. added. (Le, Anthony)
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of COUNSEL Jamie D. Wells for Defendants Gas Transmission Northwest LLC and Tuscarora Gas Transmission Company. (Wells, Jamie) Modified on 9/21/2021 (Benson, A.).
September 8, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs Gas Transmission Northwest LLC, Tuscarora Gas Transmission Company. (Wells, Jamie)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #7 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/03/21. Added attorney Addison E. Fontein, PHV for Gas Transmission Northwest LLC and Tuscarora Gas Transmission Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Benson, A.)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #6 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/03/21. Added attorney Miles O. Indest, PHV for Gas Transmission Northwest LLC and Tuscarora Gas Transmission Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Benson, A.)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #5 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/03/21. Added attorney Yasser A. Madriz, PHV for Gas Transmission Northwest LLC and Tuscarora Gas Transmission Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Benson, A.)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #4 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/03/21. Added attorney A. Wolfgang McGavran, PHV for Gas Transmission Northwest LLC and Tuscarora Gas Transmission Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Benson, A.)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Gas Transmission Northwest LLC, Tuscarora Gas Transmission Company for attorney Addison E. Fontein to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9801428) (Wells, Jamie)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Gas Transmission Northwest LLC, Tuscarora Gas Transmission Company for attorney Miles O. Indest to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9801418) (Wells, Jamie)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Gas Transmission Northwest LLC, Tuscarora Gas Transmission Company for attorney Yasser A. Madriz to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9801403) (Wells, Jamie)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Gas Transmission Northwest LLC, Tuscarora Gas Transmission Company for attorney A. Wolfgang McGavran to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9801386) (Wells, Jamie)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Consent, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Cochrane Extraction Partnership, Cochrane Extraction Plant Ltd., Inter Pipeline Extraction Ltd., Inter Pipeline Ltd.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jamie D. Wells* *McGuireWoods LLP* *Two Embarcadero Center Suite 1300* *San Francisco, CA 94111*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cochrane Extraction Partnership, Cochrane Extraction Plant Ltd., Inter Pipeline Extraction Ltd., Inter Pipeline Ltd. by Gas Transmission Northwest LLC, Tuscarora Gas Transmission Company. Attorney Wells, Jamie D. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9778954) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wells, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gas Transmission Northwest LLC et al v. Cochrane Extraction Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gas Transmission Northwest LLC
Represented By: Jamie D. Wells
Represented By: A. Wolfgang McGavran, PHV
Represented By: Addison E. Fontein, PHV
Represented By: Anthony Q. Le
Represented By: Miles O. Indest, PHV
Represented By: Yasser A. Madriz, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tuscarora Gas Transmission Company
Represented By: Jamie D. Wells
Represented By: A. Wolfgang McGavran, PHV
Represented By: Addison E. Fontein, PHV
Represented By: Anthony Q. Le
Represented By: Miles O. Indest, PHV
Represented By: Yasser A. Madriz, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochrane Extraction Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochrane Extraction Plant Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter Pipeline Extraction Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter Pipeline Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?