Rice v. Kimberly-Clark Corporation
Plaintiff: Tawanna Rice and Kelly Rice
Defendant: Kimberly-Clark Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv01519
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/18/2021 SETTING dates and deadlines as follows: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint due by 10/27/2021. Defendant's Responsive Pleading due by 12/15/2021. If defendant files a motion to dismiss, plaintiff's opposition shall be due by 1/28/2022, any reply by defendant shall be due by 2/11/2022, and the Motion Hearing would be on 3/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller if necessary. (Coll, A)
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re Amended Complain and Briefing Schedule by Kimberly-Clark Corporation. (Loose, Timothy) Modified on 10/15/2021 (Benson, A.).
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint by Kimberly-Clark Corporation. (Loose, Timothy)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Timothy William Loose on behalf of Kimberly-Clark Corporation. Attorney Loose, Timothy William added. (Loose, Timothy)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Kimberly-Clark Corporation served on 9/1/2021. (Nelson, John) Modified on 9/9/2021 (Kaminski, H).
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kimberly-Clark Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Nelson* *Finkelstein and Krinsk LLP* *501 West Broadway, Suite 1260* *San Diego, CA 92101*. (Kaminski, H)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kimberly-Clark Corporation by Tawanna Rice, Kelly Rice. Attorney Nelson, John added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9782345) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, John) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Kimberly-Clark Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawanna Rice
Represented By: John J. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Rice
Represented By: John J. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly-Clark Corporation
Represented By: Timothy William Loose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?