(PC) Green v. Diaz et al
Plaintiff: Frank G. Green
Defendant: Ralph Diaz, S. Spain and S. Puricelli
Case Number: 2:2021cv01582
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of INTENT to DISMISS DEFENDANT'S Ralph Diaz and S. Puricelli from #1 Civil Rights Complaint by Frank G. Green. (Rodriguez, E)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/30/2021 ORDERING plaintiff may file a first amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order served on Frank G. Green. (Yin, K)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP served on the Director of CDCR pursuant to #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from the Prison Account of Frank G. Green signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/24/2021.Plaintiff's motion to proceed ifp is granted by separate order. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with this order. The appropriate agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/24/2021 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 request to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Frank G. Green. (Yin, K)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Frank G. Green (Rodriguez, E)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Frank G. Green, CDCR# G-65635 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *9/2/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 10/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Benson, A.)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Frank G. Green. (Benson, A.) Modified on 9/3/2021 (Benson, A.).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Frank G. Green. (Benson, A.)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Frank G. Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Green v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank G. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Puricelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?