A.A.M. et al v. City of Sacramento, et al
Plaintiff: A.A.M., Wendy Grijalva, A.B.M. and Joseph Morales
Defendant: City of Sacramento and Jeremiah Jarvis
Case Number: 2:2021cv01619
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by City of Sacramento, Jeremiah Jarvis. Attorney Richmond, Sean D. added.(Richmond, Sean)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants served on 10/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Katz, Stewart) Modified on 10/21/2021 (Coll, A).
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by A.A.M., A.B.M., Wendy Grijalva, Joseph Morales (Katz, Stewart)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Sacramento, Jeremiah Jarvis* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stewart L. Katz* *Law Office of Stewart Katz* *555 University Ave., Suite 270* *Sacramento, CA 95825*. (Tupolo, A)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Joseph Morales, A.A.M., A.B.M., Wendy Grijalva. Attorney Katz, Stewart L. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9810553) (Katz, Stewart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.A.M. et al v. City of Sacramento, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.A.M.
Represented By: Stewart L. Katz
Represented By: Dale K. Galipo
Represented By: Hang Dieu Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Grijalva
Represented By: Stewart L. Katz
Represented By: Dale K. Galipo
Represented By: Hang Dieu Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.B.M.
Represented By: Stewart L. Katz
Represented By: Dale K. Galipo
Represented By: Hang Dieu Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Morales
Represented By: Stewart L. Katz
Represented By: Dale K. Galipo
Represented By: Hang Dieu Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sacramento
Represented By: Sean D. Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah Jarvis
Represented By: Sean D. Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?