Kabasele v. Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dorcas-Cothy Kabasele
Defendant: Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01639
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/14/2023 re #34 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement #34 : Counsel on both sides shall simultaneously submit supplemental briefing addressing the concerns (outlined in this order) on or before 4/7/2023. A further hearing will be held on 4/17/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (See order for further details.) (Kirksey Smith, K)
March 6, 2023 Filing 39 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 3/6/2023 re Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement #34 . Court confers with counsel re the pending motion. Plaintiff's counsel informs the Court that there is a numerical error in the pleadings. Court to review the pleadings applying the stated corrections, as noted on the record, and will notify counsel if the matter is submitted or if a further hearing is necessary. Court to issue a separate order. Plaintiff's Counsel Robert Wassermann present. Defendant's Counsel Leo Li present. Court Reporter: Jennifer Coulthard. (Kirksey Smith, K)
March 3, 2023 Filing 38 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to MODIFY the Class Action Settlement Agreement by Dorcas-Cothy Kabasele. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sasooness, Shawn) Modified on 3/6/2023 (Rodriguez, E).
February 6, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 USC Section 1715(b) by Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. re #34 Motion for Preliminary Approval. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perelshteyn, Sofya) Modified on 2/9/2023 (Reader, L).
February 6, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to #34 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. (Perelshteyn, Sofya) Modified on 2/9/2023 (Reader, L).
January 23, 2023 Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The Court, having receiving the filing of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement #34 filed 1/20/2023, hereby vacates the 1/30/2023 status conference. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 20, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Dorcas-Cothy Kabasele. Attorney Sasooness, Shawn added. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Declaration of Robert J. Wassermann, #3 Declaration of Shawn Sasooness, #4 Proposed Order)(Sasooness, Shawn) Modified on 2/1/2023 (Reader, L).
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/5/2023 EXTENDING by 15 days to 1/20/2023, for Plaintiff to file a Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, or the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report. Scheduling Conference Reset for 1/30/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb.(Reader, L)
January 5, 2023 Filing 32 PROPOSED ORDER re #31 Status Report by Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. (Perelshteyn, Sofya) Modified on 1/19/2023 (Benson, A.).
January 5, 2023 Filing 31 FURTHER JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. (Perelshteyn, Sofya) Modified on 1/6/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/5/2022 ORDERING that Plaintiff's deadline to file a Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement is EXTENDED by 30 days, from 12/5/2022 to 1/5/2023, or the parties shall file a further joint status report if the motion has not been filed by that date. The Status Conference Re Settlement is RESET for 1/17/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb and shall be automatically vacated upon the filing of said motion. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 2, 2022 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER re #28 Status Report by Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.. (Li, Leo) Modified on 12/5/2022 (Kaminski, H).
December 1, 2022 Filing 28 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.. (Li, Leo)
September 29, 2022 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): Pursuant to a #26 Notice of Settlement filed on 9/29/2022, this case has settled. In accordance with said Notice, the motion for preliminary approval of settlement shall be filed no later than 12/5/2022, or a joint status report if the motion has not been filed by that date. The Pretrial Conference date of 11/6/2023 and all other pending dates and deadlines are VACATED. A Status Conference Re Settlement is set in this action for 12/19/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, and shall be automatically vacated upon the filing of said motion. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 29, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Dorcas-Cothy Kabasele. Dispositional Docs due by 11/28/2022. (Wasserman, Robert)
March 1, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER by Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc..(Perelshteyn, Sofya)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STATUS PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/23/2022 VACATING the Status Pretrial Scheduling hearing scheduled for 2/28/2022. Initial Disclosures required by FRCP 26(a)(1) by 3/8/2022. Disclose experts and produce reports FRCP 26(a)(2) by 5/5/2023. Expert testimony intended solely for rebuttal 6/2/2023. Discovery due by 6/30/2023. Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by 9/30/2022. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/25/2023, and Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb.(Reader, L)
February 15, 2022 Filing 23 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. by Dorcas-Cothy Kabasele.(Wasserman, Robert)
February 14, 2022 Filing 22 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.. (Perelshteyn, Sofya)
February 10, 2022 Filing 21 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Sofya Perelshteyn for Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.. (Perelshteyn, Sofya)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/26/2022 GRANTING #14 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint and GRANTING plaintiff 20 days to file a Third Amended Complaint. (Coll, A)
January 24, 2022 Filing 19 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 1/24/2022 re #14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Counsel argue. MOTION SUBMITTED. The Court shall issue a separate order. Plaintiff's Counsel Vladimir Kozina present. Defendant's Counsel Jon Meer present. Court Reporter: Jennifer Coulthard. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 24, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Vladimir Joseph Kozina on behalf of Dorcas-Cothy Kabasele. Attorney Kozina, Vladimir Joseph added. (Kozina, Vladimir)
January 14, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY by Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. re #14 Motion to Dismiss,. Attorney Meer, Jon D. added. (Meer, Jon)
January 10, 2022 Filing 16 OPPOSITION by Dorcas-Cothy Kabasele to #14 Motion to Dismiss,. (Wasserman, Robert)
December 16, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The parties are hereby notified that the Scheduling Conference is continued from 1/3/2022 to 2/28/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, pending hearing on #14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss now set for 1/24/2022. A joint status report shall be filed no later than 2/14/2022 in accordance with the #3 Court's Order Re Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference filed 9/13/2021.(Kirksey Smith, K)
December 14, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to DISMISS by Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. Attorney Jackson, Justin added. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Justin J. Jackson, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B , #5 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Justin)
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Dorcas-Cothy Kabasele.(Wasserman, Robert)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/16/2021 WITHDRAWING #7 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice; GRANTING plaintiff leave to file a Second Amended Complaint within 5 days; DIRECTING defendant to file their responsive pleading within 21 days after being served with plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; and VACATING the 11/29/2021 Hearing Date. (Coll, A)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal by Dorcas-Cothy Kabasele. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wasserman, Robert) Modified on 11/18/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Li, Leo)
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. (Li, Leo)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 3:21-cv-07458-TSH by Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. (Li, Leo) Modified on 10/14/2021 (Huang, H).
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. Attorney Li, Leo Q. added. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Li, Leo) Modified on 10/14/2021 (Huang, H).
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Scardigli, Nicholas)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. by Dorcas-Cothy Kabasele.(Scardigli, Nicholas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Scardigli, Nicholas)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Rodriguez, E)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nicholas John Scardigli* *Mayall Hurley, PC* *2453 Grand Canal Blvd.* *Stockton, CA 95207*. (Rodriguez, E)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. by Dorcas-Cothy Kabasele. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9812774) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scardigli, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kabasele v. Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorcas-Cothy Kabasele
Represented By: Nicholas John Scardigli
Represented By: Robert Joshua Wasserman
Represented By: William J. Gorham, III
Represented By: Robert Wassermann
Represented By: Shawn Sasooness
Represented By: Vladimir Joseph Kozina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.
Represented By: Leo Q. Li
Represented By: Jon D. Meer
Represented By: Justin Jackson
Represented By: Sofya Perelshteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?