Los Altos Boots, Inc. et al v. Bonta et al
Plaintiff: Los Altos Boots, Inc., Wild West Boots, Inc., Croko International, Inc., Boot Star, Inc., Magna Leather Corporation, Larson Leather Corporation and Snappers S.A. de C.V.
Defendant: Rob Bonta and Charlton Bonham
Intervenor: Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International and Humane Society of the United States
Case Number: 2:2021cv01652
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
2 Judge: Morrison C England
3 Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/10/2021 GRANTING #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction ENJOINING the defendants, their employees, agents, and successors in office from enforcing California Penal Code sections 653o(c) and 653r in connection with the importation, possession, or sale of caiman bodies, parts, or products until the final disposition of this case. The court does not require the plaintiffs to give security. (Coll, A)
November 10, 2021 Filing 34 OPPOSITION by Boot Star, Inc., Croko International, Inc., Larson Leather Corporation, Los Altos Boots, Inc., Magna Leather Corporation, Snappers S.A. de C.V., Wild West Boots, Inc. to #29 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hughes, Christopher)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/8/2021 CONTINUING the #29 Motion to Dismiss Hearing to 12/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller with plaintiff's Opposition due by 11/10/2021 and defendant's reply due by 11/24/2021. (Coll, A)
November 4, 2021 Filing 32 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing and Adjust Briefing Schedule #29 Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Hughes, Christopher) Modified on 11/5/2021 (Huang, H).
October 29, 2021 Filing 31 MINUTES for MOTION HEARING held via videoconference before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/29/2021. Plaintiffs' Counsel, David Frulla, Christopher Hughes, and Bret Sparks, present. Defendants' Counsel, Ali Karaouni and Gwynne Hunter, present. After hearing oral arguments as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #16 ), the court took the matter under submission. A written order will issue. Court Reporter: Thresha Spencer. (Text Only Entry) (York, M)
October 22, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY by Boot Star, Inc., Croko International, Inc., Larson Leather Corporation, Los Altos Boots, Inc., Magna Leather Corporation, Snappers S.A. de C.V., Wild West Boots, Inc. to RESPONSE to #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. (Hughes, Christopher)
October 22, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to DISMISS by Charlton Bonham, Rob Bonta. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Karaouni, Ali)
October 21, 2021 Filing 28 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Intervention re #19 Order, #4 Notice of Related Case(s) by Proposed Intervenors. Attorney Sivas, Deborah Ann added. (Sivas, Deborah) Modified on 10/25/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 15, 2021 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by Defendants in OPPOSITION to #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. Attorney Karaouni, Ali Ahmad added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Karaouni, Ali) Modified on 10/18/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 13, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Charlton Bonham and Rob Bonta served on 09/16/21. (Hughes, Christopher) Modified on 10/14/2021 (Benson, A.).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #8 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/27/21. Added attorney David E. Frulla, PHV for all Plaintiffs. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Benson, A.)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #7 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/27/21. Added attorney Bret A. Sparks, PHV for all Plaintiffs. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Benson, A.)
September 24, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Boot Star, Inc., Croko International, Inc., Larson Leather Corporation, Los Altos Boots, Inc., Magna Leather Corporation, Snappers S.A. de C.V., Wild West Boots, Inc. re 22 Minute Order,. (Hughes, Christopher)
September 24, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/24/2021: Plaintiffs are directed to serve a copy of the Reassignment Order, filed at ECF No. #19 , and the Amended New Case Documents, filed at ECF No. #21 , on Defendants not yet appearing (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
September 22, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A)
September 22, 2021 Filing 20 [DISREGARD, Incorrect hearing date. See #21 Amended Civil New Case Documents] CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A) Modified on 9/22/2021 (Coll, A).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/22/2021 REASSIGNING CASE 2:21-cv-01652-MCE-DB to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings; VACATING all previously set hearing dates in that case, and RESETTING the Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing in that case for 10/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. New Case Number: 2:21-cv-01652-KJM-CKD. (Coll, A)
September 17, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Rob Bonta served on 9/15/2021. (Hughes, Christopher) Modified on 9/20/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 17, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Plaintiffs re #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Hughes, Christopher) Modified on 9/20/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 15, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration Rodolfo (Rudy) Avila, #3 Declaration Humberto Avila, #4 Declaration Scott Downes, #5 Declaration Chuck Larsen, #6 Declaration Alex Trachter, #7 Declaration Hussein A. Ghacham, #8 Declaration Anita Valdez, #9 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Christopher)
September 15, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Wild West Boots, Inc.. (Hughes, Christopher)
September 15, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Snappers S.A. de C.V.. (Hughes, Christopher)
September 15, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Magna Leather Corporation. (Hughes, Christopher)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Larson Leather Corporation. (Hughes, Christopher)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Croko International, Inc.. (Hughes, Christopher)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Boot Star, Inc.. (Hughes, Christopher)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Los Altos Boots, Inc.. (Hughes, Christopher)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED #3 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER for attorney David E. Frulla to appear Pro Hac Vice submitted by Boot Star, Inc., Croko International, Inc., Larson Leather Corporation, Los Altos Boots, Inc., Magna Leather Corporation, Snappers S.A. de C.V., Wild West Boots, Inc. (Hughes, Christopher) Modified on 9/14/2021 (York, M).
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED #2 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER for attorney Brett A. Sparks to appear Pro Hac Vice submitted by Boot Star, Inc., Croko International, Inc., Larson Leather Corporation, Los Altos Boots, Inc., Magna Leather Corporation, Snappers S.A. de C.V., Wild West Boots, Inc. (Hughes, Christopher) Modified on 9/14/2021 (York, M).
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Rodriguez, E)
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Charlton Bonham, Rob Bonta* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christopher D. Hughes* *Nossaman LLP* *621 Capitol Mall, Ste. 2500* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Rodriguez, E)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:19-cv-02488-KJM, 2:19-cv-02471-KJM by All Defendants. (Hughes, Christopher)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Boot Star, Inc., Croko International, Inc., Larson Leather Corporation, Los Altos Boots, Inc., Magna Leather Corporation, Snappers S.A. de C.V., Wild West Boots, Inc. for attorney David E. Frulla to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9815175) (Hughes, Christopher)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Boot Star, Inc., Croko International, Inc., Larson Leather Corporation, Los Altos Boots, Inc., Magna Leather Corporation, Snappers S.A. de C.V., Wild West Boots, Inc. for attorney Bret A. Sparks to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9815156) (Hughes, Christopher)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hughes, Christopher) Mo
September 13, 2021 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9815052. (Hughes, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Los Altos Boots, Inc. et al v. Bonta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Altos Boots, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Hughes
Represented By: Bret A. Sparks, PHV
Represented By: David E. Frulla, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wild West Boots, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Hughes
Represented By: Bret A. Sparks, PHV
Represented By: David E. Frulla, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Croko International, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Hughes
Represented By: Bret A. Sparks, PHV
Represented By: David E. Frulla, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boot Star, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Hughes
Represented By: Bret A. Sparks, PHV
Represented By: David E. Frulla, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magna Leather Corporation
Represented By: Christopher D. Hughes
Represented By: Bret A. Sparks, PHV
Represented By: David E. Frulla, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larson Leather Corporation
Represented By: Christopher D. Hughes
Represented By: Bret A. Sparks, PHV
Represented By: David E. Frulla, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snappers S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Christopher D. Hughes
Represented By: Bret A. Sparks, PHV
Represented By: David E. Frulla, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Bonta
Represented By: Ali Ahmad Karaouni
Represented By: Gwynne Bay Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlton Bonham
Represented By: Ali Ahmad Karaouni
Represented By: Gwynne Bay Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Humane Society International
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Humane Society of the United States
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?