Farrell et al v. New Millennium Concepts, LTD
Plaintiff: Tara Farrell, Henly Velarde and Douglas Wells
Defendant: New Millennium Concepts, LTD
Case Number: 2:2021cv01691
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant New Millennium Concepts, LTD. (Jacobs, Michelle)
November 11, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to DISMISS by New Millennium Concepts, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michelle)
November 11, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to CHANGE VENUE by New Millennium Concepts, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Shawn Elliott, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michelle)
November 11, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by New Millennium Concepts, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Shawn Elliott, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michelle)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/04/2021 GRANTING #8 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Michelle C. Jacobs, PHV for New Millennium Concepts, LTD. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Rodriguez, E)
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order by New Millennium Concepts, LTD. (Erickson, Mark) Modified on 11/4/2021 (Michel, G.).
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by New Millennium Concepts, LTD for attorney Michelle C. Jacobs to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9912208) (Erickson, Mark)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/2/2021 SUBSTITUTING Mark David Erickson for New Millennium Concepts, LTD in place of attorney Richard Thaddeus Behrens. (Huang, H)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by New Millennium Concepts, LTD. (Erickson, Mark)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to respond to the #1 Complaint by New Millennium Concepts, LTD. Attorney Behrens, Richard Thaddeus ADDED. (Behrens, Richard)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: New Millennium Concepts, LTD served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Bruce, Katherine)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *New Millennium Concepts, LTD* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Katherine A. Bruce* *Clarkson Law Firm* *22525 Pacific Coast Highway* *Malibu, CA 90265*. (Huang, H)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Millennium Concepts, LTD by Tara Farrell, Henly Velarde, Douglas Wells. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9823341) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bruce, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farrell et al v. New Millennium Concepts, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Farrell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bruce
Represented By: Kelsey Elling
Represented By: Ryan Jack Clarkson
Represented By: Shireen M. Clarkson
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henly Velarde
Represented By: Katherine A. Bruce
Represented By: Kelsey Elling
Represented By: Ryan Jack Clarkson
Represented By: Shireen M. Clarkson
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Wells
Represented By: Katherine A. Bruce
Represented By: Kelsey Elling
Represented By: Ryan Jack Clarkson
Represented By: Shireen M. Clarkson
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Millennium Concepts, LTD
Represented By: Mark David Erickson
Represented By: Michelle C. Jacobs, PHV
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?