(PC) Miller v. Hollison et al
Plaintiff: Elijah Lee Miller
Defendant: Sam Hollison, I. Salinovich, J. Alardo and J. Bordewick
Case Number: 2:2021cv01700
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/19/2021. (for E-Service) (Yin, K)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Sam Hollison* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Elijah Lee Miller AR-5509* *California Health Care Facility* *P.O. Box 213040* *Stockton, CA 95213*. (Yin, K)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/18/2021 FINDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE AND DIRECTING E-SERVICE on the following defendant: *Sam Hollison*. Defendants I. Salinovich, J. Alardo, and J. Bordewick are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk shall serve this order via email on the CDCR, along with a summons, the Operative Complaint, the Order re Consent and Notice of E-Service Waiver. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Waiver) (Yin, K)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate served on Elijah Lee Miller. (Yin, K)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF ELECTION by Elijah Lee Miller: Plaintiff chooses to proceed with complaint as screened. (Huang, H)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Reader, L)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP served on the Director of CDCR pursuant to #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from the Prison Account of Elijah Lee Miller signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/22/2021. The appropriate agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/22/2021 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 request to proceed ifp and DISMISSING claims against defendants Salinovich, Alardo and Bordewick with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff is not obliged to amend his complaint. The allegations in the pleading are sufficient to state a potentially cognizable claim against defendant Hollison. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with the concurrent order. Plaintiff shall also complete and return the attached form notifying the court how he wants to proceed. (Yin, K)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Elijah Lee Miller. (Kastilahn, A)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 , #7 Orders served on Elijah Lee Miller. (Yin, K)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Elijah Lee Miller, CDC AR-5509 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Kastilahn, A)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Elijah Lee Miller. (Kastilahn, A)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Elijah Lee Miller.(Kastilahn, A)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Elijah Lee Miller. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Miller v. Hollison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Lee Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Hollison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Salinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Alardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bordewick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?