(HC) Dennis v. Samul
Petitioner: Robert K. Dennis
Respondent: D Samul
Case Number: 2:2021cv01906
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Marrujo, C)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-06621.
October 14, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Robert K. Dennis. (Marrujo, C)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (SACRAMENTO DIVISION) by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California, Sacramento Division. See E.D. Cal. L.R. 120(d). (see document for further details). Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) [Transferred from cacd on 10/14/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 10/14/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by petitioner Robert K Dennis. (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 10/14/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V Castillo.(Filing fee due), filed by petitioner Robert K Dennis. (mrgo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2021: #1 CV-111) (mrgo). [Transferred from cacd on 10/14/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Dennis v. Samul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert K. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D Samul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?