(HC) Martin v. Johnson
Petitioner: O. Z. Martin
Respondent: R. C. Johnson
Case Number: 2:2021cv01967
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General, per #4 Order. (Huang, H)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/1/2021. Consent or Decline due by 1/6/2022. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General per #4 Order) (Huang, H)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/1/2021 GRANTING #3 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING Respondent to file a response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within 60 days from the date of this order. If the response is an answer, petitioner's reply, if any, shall be filed and served within 30 days after service of the answer. If the response is a motion, petitioner's opposition or statement of non-opposition shall be filed and served within 30 days after service of the motion, and respondent's reply, if any, shall be filed and served within 14 days thereafter. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General)(Huang, H)
December 1, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on O. Z. Martin. (Huang, H)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by O. Z. Martin. (Huang, H)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Huang, H)
October 25, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on O. Z. Martin. (Huang, H)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against R. C. Johnson by O. Z. Martin.(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Martin v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: O. Z. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?