Constantine et al v. Trestles LLC
Plaintiff: Sandy Constantine
Defendant: Trestles LLC Doing business as City Creek Post Acute
Case Number: 2:2021cv01987
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of ERRATA by Trestles LLC re #16 Reply.. (Pardo, Oscar)
December 9, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to #13 Opposition by Trestles LLC. (Beach, David) Modified on 12/10/2021 (Huang, H).
December 6, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 1/13/2022, hearing on the Motion to Remand #11 is VACATED and SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #11 Motion to Remand : Motion Hearing RESET for 1/13/2022 at 02:00 PM before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Smith, Dawn)
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 OPPOSITION by Sandy Constantine to #7 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dawn M. Smith, #2 Ex. 1 Original Complaint, #3 Ex. 2 AO21-01, #4 Ex. 3, #5 Ex. 4)(Smith, Dawn) Modified on 11/29/2021 (Benson, A.).
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court is in receipt of Motion to Remand and Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss #11 . The motion as filed is deficient and the moving party is directed to only renotice the motion in compliance with Local Rule 230(b). Accordingly, the 12/16/2021 hearing date is VACATED. Available civil law and motion calendar dates can be found on the Court's website at www.caed.uscourts.gov by following these menu options: Judges/All Judges/ Senior United States District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (MCE)/Standard Information (under the Case Management Procedures). Reservation of a hearing date is not required. All hearings are at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7. (Deutsch, S)
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to REMAND and OPPOSITION to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Sandy Constantine. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2021 at 02:00 PM before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dawn M. Smith, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Smith, Dawn) Modified on 11/23/2021 (Coll, A).
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Trestles LLC. (Pardo, Oscar)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by relief courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the December 16, 2021 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss by Trestles LLC is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Weisel, D.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Trestles LLC in re #7 Motion to Dismiss. (Pardo, Oscar)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by Trestles LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Pardo, Oscar) Modified on 11/2/2021 (Kaminski, H).
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Trestles LLC. (Pardo, Oscar)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Trestles LLC. (Beach, David)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Trestles LLC in re #1 Notice of Removal. (Beach, David)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Trestles LLC (Beach, David)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2021-00308878 by Trestles LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9894678) (Beach, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Constantine et al v. Trestles LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Constantine
Represented By: Dawn M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trestles LLC Doing business as City Creek Post Acute
Represented By: David Fernando Beach
Represented By: Oscar Amor Pardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?