(PC) Smith v. Municipality of Fresno County et al
Case Number: 2:2021cv01992
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/26/24 ORDERING Plaintiff, within 21 days, to file either an Opposition or a Statement of Non-Opposition to the 135 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Benson, A.)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/18/2023 DIRECTING plaintiff to file the following: a Notice of Change of Address with the court within 7 days and a Non-Prisoner IFP application and a proper response to defendants' 135 Motion for Summary Judgment within 30 days. Within 7 days from the date of this order, defendants shall serve plaintiff with a copy of their 135 Motion for Summary Judgment if they have not already done so. (Spichka, K.)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/16/2023 DENYING plaintiff's 138 omnibus motion, and GRANTING in part plaintiff's 148 motion for an extension of time. The Clerk shall send plaintiff copies of the following: a. This court's ifp application for a non-prisoner; b. The Rand Notice included in defendants' motion for summary judgment (see ECF No. 135-1); c. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56; and d. Local Rules 230 and 260. Within 30 days, plaintiff sh all file: a. The completed ifp application by a non-prisoner, and b. Either an opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment or a statement of non-opposition to the motion which complies with the Rand Notice and federal and local rules. (Yin, K)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/06/2023 DIRECTING Plaintiff to file, within 30 days, a completed Motion to Proceed IFP by a non-prisoner and either an opposition to defendants' 135 Motion for Summary Judgment or a statem ent of non-opposition to the motion which complies with the Rand Notice and federal and local rules. Plaintiff's failure to fully and timely comply with this order in its entirety will result in a recommendation that this matter be dismissed for failure to comply with court orders. (Spichka, K.)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/20/2023 ADOPTING in FULL 122 Findings and Recommendations, and DENYING 120 Plaintiff's Petition for a Writ of Mandate. (Reader, L)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/03/2023 DIRECTING the Plaintiff to file the in forma pauperis application for a non-prisoner and to SHOW CAUSE as to why the 135 Motion for Summary Judgment should not be granted within 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/11/2023 DENYING plaintiff's 127 motion for a change of venue, 128 motion to compel, and 132 motion for an extension of time. (Yin, K)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/13/22 ADOPTING in full 119 Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff's 118 motion for disqualification is DENIED as unsupported as to the assigned United States District Judge. (Kastilahn, A)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/03/22, LIFTING THE STAY of the 111 pretrial motion deadline. The discovery and scheduling order 88 is MODIFIED IN PART to extend the deadline for dispositive pretrial motions to January 20, 2023.(Plummer, M)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/19/22 DENYING 116 Request for Ruling, DENYING 117 Motion Regarding Discovery, DENYING 118 Motion for Disqualification, as to the undersigned United States Magistr ate Judge. It is further RECOMMENDED that the 118 Motion for Disqualification be denied, as to the assigned United States District Judge. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these finding and recommendations. (Licea Chavez, V)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/29/2022 GRANTING defendants' 113 motion for extension of time. The deadline to take plaintiff's deposition is hereby extended to 10/19/2022. All other portions of the Court's 9/21/2022, order will remain in full force and effect. (Yin, K)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/26/22 DENYING 106 Request for status; Motion for the appointment of counsel; Motion for sanctions; Motion for a protective order; and Motion to compel with costs. In the future, plaintiff shall file unrelated motions separately. Plaintiff is warned that his failure to file his motions separately and/or to his failureto conform his filings to these Rules will result in documents being disregarded and returned to him. (Plummer, M)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/21/2022 GRANTING defendants' 107 motion to compel plaintiff's deposition and their motion to stay the pretrial motions deadline. Within 21 days, plaintiff shall attend and cooperate fully in his deposition as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30. The pretrial motions deadline currently calendared for 9/30/2022 is hereby STAYED pending completion of plaintiff's deposition. Within one week of the conclusion of plaintiff's deposition, defense counsel shall file a notice with the court indicating that plaintiff's deposition has been completed. (Yin, K)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/29/2022 GRANTING defendants' 104 ex parte application to modify the scheduling order. The scheduling order is modified as follows: The discovery cutoff is extended to 8/22/2022, for the purpose of allowing defendants to take plaintiff's deposition; and the deadline for defendants to file a motion to compel is extended to 8/29/2022. All other portions of the Scheduling Order will remain in full force and effect. (Yin, K)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/26/2022 DENYING 102 Motion to Compel without prejudice. (Huang, H)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/05/22 DISMISSING Municipality of Fresno County, Daniel Paramo, John Sutton, Debbie Asuncion and Fresno County Jail Staff pursuant to FRCP 41(a). The Clerk of Court shall update the case caption of the docket accordingly.(Plummer, M)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/12/2022 DENYING 81 motion for a settlement conference; 83 , 86 , and 89 motions to change venue; and 94 request for production of documents. (Perdue, C.)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING 75 Motion for Change of Venue to District of Oregon; ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/27/2021. New Case Number 2:21-cv-1992 KMJ-AC. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Smith v. Municipality of Fresno County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?