(PC) Kononov v. Sacramento County, et al
Plaintiff: Vitaly Kononov
Defendant: Sacramento County, City of Sacramento, Sacramento County Sheriff Department and Sacramento County Main Jail
Case Number: 2:2021cv02076
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, RTS, Not in custody: #5 Order, sent to Vitaly Kononov. Notice of Change of Address due by 2/22/2022. (Reader, L)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/3/2021 ORDERING the Clerk to send plaintiff an application to proceed ifp and a civil rights complaint form. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall submit the following: 1. A clear and complete certified copy of his inmate trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint; 2. The in forma pauperis application provided to him by the court. The affidavit section of the form to be completed and signed by a jail official, and 3. A first amended complaint on the civil rights complaint form provided by the court. Plaintiff is warned that failure to comply fully with this order within the time allotted will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice. (Yin, K)
December 3, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order with 1983 and ifp prisoner forms served on Vitaly Kononov. (Yin, K)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Benson, A.)
November 10, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for DJ Presider served on Vitaly Kononov. (Benson, A.)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Vitaly Kononov. (Benson, A.)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Vitaly Kononov.(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Kononov v. Sacramento County, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vitaly Kononov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Main Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?