Lopes v. SEIU Local 1000 et al
Plaintiff: Brandi Lopes
Defendant: SEIU Local 1000 and Richard L. Brown
Case Number: 2:2021cv02079
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL by Richard L. Brown, SEIU Local 1000. (Kasper, Ashleigh) Modified on 12/27/2021 (Kaminski, H).
December 13, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER by Richard L. Brown, SEIU Local 1000.(Kasper, Ashleigh)
November 30, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/30/2021: Pursuant to the filing of the First Amended Complaint (ECF No. #9 ), Defendant Richard Brown's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #5 ) is hereby DENIED as MOOT. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) Modified on 11/30/2021 (Krueger, M).
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Brandi Lopes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mueller, Michael) Modified on 11/30/2021 (Benson, A.).
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/17/2021: On the Court's own motion, Defendant Richard Brown's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #5 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 12/16/2021 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. All briefing shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 230(c) and (d), and the 12/16/2021 date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David Lee Fiol on behalf of Brandi Lopes. Attorney Fiol, David Lee added. (Fiol, David)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER by SEIU Local 1000.(Kasper, Ashleigh)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS by Richard L. Brown. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kasper, Ashleigh)
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ashleigh Kasper on behalf of Richard L. Brown, SEIU Local 1000. (Kasper, Ashleigh)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Richard L. Brown, SEIU Local 1000 re #2 Civil New Case Documents for TLN. (Kasper, Ashleigh) Modified on 11/16/2021 (Coll, A).
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento, case number 34-2021-00309018 by Richard L. Brown, SEIU Local 1000. Civil Filing Fee Receipt #ACAEDC-9920054 $402 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashleigh R. Kasper, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kasper, Ashleigh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopes v. SEIU Local 1000 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Lopes
Represented By: Michael Kipp Mueller
Represented By: David Lee Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU Local 1000
Represented By: Ashleigh Kasper
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Ranen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Brown
Represented By: Ashleigh Kasper
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Ranen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?