(HC) Calderon v. Covello
Petitioner: Juan C. Calderon
Respondent: P. Covello
Case Number: 2:2021cv02084
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/5/2022 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a District Judge and to update the docket to reflect the new case number. This case is assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for all further proceedings. New Case Number is 2:21-cv-2084 KJM DMC (HC). (Yin, K)
January 5, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Juan C. Calderon. (Yin, K)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/16/2021 ORDERING petitioner to submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the certification required by Rule 3(a)(2), or pay the appropriate filing fee. (Henshaw, R)
November 17, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and IFP application served on Juan C. Calderon. (Henshaw, R)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Huang, H)
November 12, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Juan C. Calderon. (Huang, H)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against P. Covello by Juan C. Calderon.(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Calderon v. Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan C. Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: P. Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?