Foulke et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Broc Foulke and Michael Foulke
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Crown Motors
Case Number: 2:2021cv02092
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Christopher James Campbell on behalf of Michael Foulke, Broc Foulke. Attorney Campbell, Christopher James added. (Campbell, Christopher)
August 15, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sara Katherine Ross on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Ross, Sara Katherine added. (Ross, Sara)
August 7, 2023 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and because there is no hearing currently before this Court, The Notice of Waiver of Personal Appearance and Consent to Conduct Hearing by Videoconference and Proposed Order #20 is DENIED as moot. (Deutsch, S)
August 4, 2023 Filing 20 WAIVER and REQUEST TO APPEAR REMOTELY by Michael Foulke, Broc Foulke. Attorney LaRocque, Elizabeth A added. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/7/2023 (Benson, A.).
July 17, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of COUNSEL by All Plaintiffs. (Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 7/18/2023 (Perdue, C.).
July 17, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Elizabeth A LaRocque on behalf of Michael Foulke. Attorney LaRocque, Elizabeth A added. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/29/23 CONTINUING the Fact discovery cut-off to 8/18/23. The dates for the disclosure of expert witnesses, dispositive motions, and the filing of the Joint Notice of Trial Readiness are set according to the procedures in #2 the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Kastilahn, A)
June 26, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Proposed Order #14 . Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order in Microsoft Word to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rules 101 and 131(c), the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S)
June 20, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 7/20/2023 hearing on the Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order is VACATED, the motion is SUBMITTED without appearance and argument, and the Court will consider the filing as a Stipulation and Proposed Order to Modify Scheduling Order. (Deutsch, S)
June 16, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER by Ford Motor Company. Attorney Jun, Patricia added. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of P. Jun, #2 Proposed Order)(Jun, Patricia)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 02/06/2023 EXTENDING the Discovery deadline to 06/16/2023. (Spichka, K.)
February 3, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to modify scheduling order by Michael Foulke, Broc Foulke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Tracy, Michael) Modified on 2/6/2023 (Licea Chavez, V).
February 3, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Lion Tracy on behalf of Michael Foulke, Broc Foulke. Attorney Tracy, Michael Lion added. (Tracy, Michael)
January 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nino Sanaia on behalf of Michael Foulke, Broc Foulke. Attorney Sanaia, Nino added. (Sanaia, Nino)
January 5, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rabiya F. Tirmizi on behalf of Michael Foulke, Broc Foulke. Attorney Tirmizi, Rabiya F. added. (Tirmizi, Rabiya)
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Tionna Dolin for Michael Foulke,Tionna Dolin for Broc Foulke, attorney Karin Kuemerle terminated (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariel Harman-Holmes on behalf of Michael Foulke, Broc Foulke. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
February 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Michael Foulke, Broc Foulke. Attorney Kuemerle, Karin added. (Kuemerle, Karin)
January 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Tionna Dolin. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 25, 2022 Filing 4 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael Foulke, Broc Foulke. Attorney Law, Daniel Albert added. (Law, Daniel)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Ford Motor Company. (Mortenson, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Shasta County Superior Court, case number 197638 by Ford Motor Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9923075) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mortenson, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortenson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foulke et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broc Foulke
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel Albert Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Michael Lion Tracy
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher James Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Foulke
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel Albert Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Michael Lion Tracy
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher James Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Michael Donn Mortenson
Represented By: Patricia Jun
Represented By: Sara Katherine Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?