(PS) Nelson Rogers v. Washington Mutual Bank, F.A. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Alice Nelson Rogers and Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, F.A., Schools Financial Credit Union, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. and Quality Loan Services Corporation
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2021cv02151
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/10/2022 DENYING Plaintiff's request to seal. The Clerk shall RETURN to plaintiff the document filed 5/4/2022, entitled "judicial notice of exercise of right to set off." Plaintiff shall CEASE filing documents in this closed case. Any future filings deemed frivolous will be ignored. (Huang, H)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #45 Order, and Document filed 5/4/2022 entitled "judicial notice of exercise of right to set off" served on Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Huang, H)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 USCA CASE NUMBER 22-15469 for #42 Notice of Appeal filed by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust. (Coll, A)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #42 Notice of Appeal filed by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust. Notice of Appeal filed *3/30/2021*, Complaint filed *11/19/2021* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *3/16/2022*. Court Reporter: *Kacy Barajas*. *Fee Status: Paid on 3/30/2022 in the amount of $505.00* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Licea Chavez, V)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #43 Appeal Processed to USCA, served on Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Licea Chavez, V)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of APPEAL by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust as to #38 Judgment & #37 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations (Licea Chavez, V)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE200120087 $505.00 Appeal Fee fbo Mary Alice Nelson Rogers by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers on 3/30/2022. (Reader, L)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/25/2022: : The Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery (ECF No. #39 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. The case was closed on 3/16/2022 (see ECF No. #37 ). The Plaintiff is cautioned that future motions filed in this closed case will be disregarded. (Text Only Entry) (Waldrop, A)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 41 Minute Order served on Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Waldrop, A)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers re #30 Findings and Recommendations. (Coll, A)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for DISCOVERY by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Coll, A)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JUDGMENT dated *3/16/2022* pursuant to order signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/16/2022. (Coll, A)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/16/2022 DENYING #32 Motion to Disqualify the Magistrate Judge; ADOPTING #30 Findings and Recommendations in full; DENYING #14 Motion to Remand; GRANTING #6 , #12 , & #20 Motions to Dismiss; and DISMISSING plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #37 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and #38 Judgment served on Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Coll, A)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust to #31 Objections to Findings and Recommendations. (Rodriguez, E)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE by Quality Loan Services Corporation to #31 Objections to Findings and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Simonson, Todd) Modified on 3/3/2022 (Coll, A).
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE by Schools Financial Credit Union to #31 Objections to Findings and Recommendations, #33 Response. (Neumann, Katrina)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. to #31 Objections to Findings and Recommendations. (Freed, John)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Disqualification of Magistrate Judge by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #30 by Plaintiffs Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/9/22 ORDERING that Plaintiff's filings at ECF No. 25 and 26, to the extent they are motions to strike, are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as improperly noticed. The hearing on SFCU's motion, currently set for March 1, 2022 #20 , is VACATED, and the matter is taken under submission. The initial scheduling conference set for May 24, 2022 #5 is VACATED AND RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #14 be DENIED. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #6 , #12 , #20 be GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of the Court be directed to CLOSE this case. F&R referred to District Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Kaminski, H)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #30 Order and Findings and Recommendations, served on Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Kaminski, H)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JUDICIAL NOTICE by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers (Kastilahn, A)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust. (Kaminski, H)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference (Zoom) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman: MOTION HEARING held on 1/25/2022. Plaintiff (appearing by phone) and defense counsel all present. The Court heard from parties regarding the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. #6 and #12 ) and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. #14 ). The motions were submitted and an order is to issue. Plaintiffs' Counsel Mary Alice Nelson-Rogers (Pro Se) present. Defendants' Counsel Katrina Neumann, Jake Freed, and Todd Simonson present. Court Reporter: Kacy Barajas. (Waldrop, A)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 27 Motion Hearing minutes served on Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Waldrop, A)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers in SUPPORT of #14 Motion to Remand. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JUDICIAL NOTICE by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Kastilahn, A)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: Zoom Instruction for 1/25/22 Hearing served on Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Donati, J)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Schools Financial Credit Union re #23 Joinder, #22 Notice of Appearance. (Goldstein, Jason)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JOINDER by Schools Financial Credit Union in re #14 Motion to Remand filed by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Goldstein, Jason)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jason Edward Goldstein on behalf of Schools Financial Credit Union. Attorney Goldstein, Jason Edward added. (Goldstein, Jason)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Schools Financial Credit Union in re #20 Motion to Dismiss,. (Neumann, Katrina)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to DISMISS by Schools Financial Credit Union. Attorney Neumann, Katrina added. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Party with Financial Interest, #2 Proposed Order)(Neumann, Katrina) Modified on 1/13/2022 (Benson, A.).
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. re #17 Opposition to Motion. (Freed, John)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of John D. Freed in support of #17 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Freed, John) Modified on 1/12/2022 (Benson, A.).
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPPOSITION by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. to #14 Motion to Remand. (Freed, John)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust re #14 Motion to Remand. (Rodriguez, E)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/28/2021: Currently pending before the undersigned are Motions to Dismiss from Defendants Quality and JP (ECF #6 , #12 ), set for a hearing before the undersigned on 1/25/2022 at 9:00 AM. Plaintiff filed a motion to remand (ECF #14 ), setting it for a January 4, 2022 hearing. However, Local Rule 230(b) requires any motion to be set for a hearing "not less than twenty-eight (28) days after service and filing of the motion." For judicial economy, Plaintiff's motion to remand shall be heard on 1/25/2022 alongside Defendants' motions to dismiss (as well as the matters in 2:21-cv-01908-JAM-KJN). Thus, the hearing set for 1/4/2022 is VACATED. Defendants' opposition to the motion to remand is due by January 11, 2022 with Plaintiff's optional reply due by January 18, 2022. The hearing will take place via Zoom and parties will receive instructions on how to appear from the Court closer to the hearing date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 15 Minute Order served on Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Waldrop, A)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE filed by Defendant Quality Loan Services Corporation re #12 Motion to Dismiss. (Simonson, Todd) Modified on 12/27/2021 (Benson, A.).
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to DISMISS by Quality Loan Services Corporation. Attorney Simonson, Todd Christopher added. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Request for Judicial Notice and Exhibits 1-6, #3 Declaration)(Simonson, Todd) Modified on 12/27/2021 (Benson, A.).
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE re #14 Motion to Remand Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Benson, A.) Modified on 12/27/2021 (Benson, A.).
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to REMAND by Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Benson, A.)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. re #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Freed, John)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Freed, John)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER re #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Freed, John) Modified on 11/29/2021 (Coll, A).
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. in re #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Freed, John)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Freed, John)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Coll, A)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Civil New Case Documents for JAM served on Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust, Mary Alice Nelson Rogers. (Coll, A)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice of Appearance. (Freed, John)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Joseph E. Addiego, III on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. Attorney Addiego, Joseph E. added. (Addiego, Joseph)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Freed, John)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento, case number 34-2021-00309810-CU-PT-GDS by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9938090) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Interested Parties)(Freed, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Nelson Rogers v. Washington Mutual Bank, F.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Alice Nelson Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Alice Nelson Rogers Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, F.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schools Financial Credit Union
Represented By: Jason Edward Goldstein
Represented By: Katrina Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Joseph E. Addiego, III
Represented By: John D. Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Services Corporation
Represented By: Todd Christopher Simonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?