(PC) Black v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: Randy Lamar Black
Defendant: P. Thompson, K. Brown, A. Boulware, N. Kendryna, Director of Bureau of Prisons, Regional Director of Western Division, Regional Director of Southeastern Division and D. Allred
Case Number: 2:2021cv02167
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/12/2022 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified trust account statement to complete his request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Henshaw, R)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order served on Randy Lamar Black. (Henshaw, R)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Randy Lamar Black re change in warden at F.C.I. Herlong. (Kastilahn, A)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Randy Lamar Black. (Kastilahn, A)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION for the right to Life by Randy Lamar Black. (Mena-Sanchez, L) Modified on 12/27/2021 (Plummer, M).
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EMERGENCY MOTION to enter evidence to support claim by Randy Lamar Black. (Kastilahn, A)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/6/2021 ORDERING plaintiff must submit either the filing fee or the application required by 1915(a) within 30 days. The Clerk shall mail plaintiff an ifp application. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this action.(Yin, K)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and ifp application served on Randy Lamar Black. (Yin, K)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATEMENT re retaliation by defendants, filed by Plaintiff Randy Lamar Black. (Kastilahn, A)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT by Randy Lamar Black re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (Reader, L)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Coll, A)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Randy Lamar Black. (Coll, A)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Randy Lamar Black. (Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Black v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Lamar Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Boulware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Kendryna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Director of Western Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Director of Southeastern Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?