(HC) Phan v. Cavello
Petitioner: Minh Kha Hoang Phan
Respondent: P. Cavello
Case Number: 2:2021cv02219
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/11/22. Consent or Decline due by 2/14/2022 (Plummer, M)
January 11, 2022 Filing 9 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Petition for writ of habeas corpus #1 served on Tami Krenzin, Attorney General. (Plummer, M)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/11/22 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Also, DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of this order.. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Attorney General) (Plummer, M)
January 11, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition,, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Minh Kha Hoang Phan. (Plummer, M)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:21-CV-2219-TLN CKD. (Rodriguez, E)
December 22, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Minh Kha Hoang Phan. New Case Number: 2:21-CV-2219-TLN CKD. (Rodriguez, E)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Minh Kha Hoang Phan (Rodriguez, E)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Minh Kha Hoang Phan, CDC BF-0297 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/10/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Plummer, M)
December 6, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Minh Kha Hoang Phan. (Plummer, M)
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Minh Kha Hoang Phan. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 12/6/2021 (Plummer, M).
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against P. Cavello by Minh Kha Hoang Phan #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kaminski, H).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Phan v. Cavello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Minh Kha Hoang Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: P. Cavello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?