White et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Leigh White and Gene Rump
Defendant: FCA US LLC and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02377
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2023 Filing 24 REQUEST for for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) by Gene Rump, Leigh White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT)(Dolin, Tionna)
July 17, 2023 Filing 23 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL terminating Ariel Harman-Holmes by All Plaintiffs. (Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 7/18/2023 (Benson, A.).
July 17, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Elizabeth A LaRocque on behalf of Gene Rump. Attorney LaRocque, Elizabeth A added. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
March 29, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nino Sanaia on behalf of Gene Rump, Leigh White. Attorney Sanaia, Nino added. (Sanaia, Nino)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/23/2023 CONTINUING Pre-Trial dates as follows: Last Day to Conduct ADR: 10/13/2013. Report To Court Concerning Mediation: 10/23/2023. Last Day to Hear Motions: 9/21/2023. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off is CONTINUED to 7/21/2023. Expert Disclosure is CONTINUED to 7/28/2023. Expert Rebuttal is CONTINUED to 8/11/2023. Expert Discovery Cut-Off is CONTINUED to 8/25/2023. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 21, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to continue Pre-Trial dates and related deadlines by Gene Rump, Leigh White. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James P. Mayo, #2 Proposed Order)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel) Modified on 3/22/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 29, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
August 29, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Reshma Bajaj on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Bajaj, Reshma added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bajaj, Reshma)
August 29, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by James P. Mayo on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Mayo, James P. added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
August 22, 2022 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/22/2022: Defendant's Proposed Substitution of Attorney, ECF No. #14 , is GRANTED. Accordingly, Attorney Spencer P. Hugret is SUBSTITUTED as counsel of record for Defendant FCA US, LLC, in place of Attorney Michael B. Sachs. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 9, 2022 Filing 14 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by FCA US, LLC. (Sachs, Michael)
May 10, 2022 Filing 13 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Tionna Dolin for Gene Rump, Leigh White, attorney Karin Kuemerle terminated (Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 5/11/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
May 5, 2022 Filing 12 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/5/2022. (Schultz, C)
May 5, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTES for SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held (via videoconference) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/5/2022, and FRCP 16 BENCH ORDER: Plaintiffs' Counsel, Ariel Harman-Holmes, present. Defendant's Counsel, Michael Sachs, present. The court and counsel discussed case scheduling. After careful consideration of the parties' comments, and confirming that initial disclosures as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) have been completed the court ORDERED the following pre-trial case schedule: the parties will jointly file a proposed discovery only protective order with the Magistrate Judge by 5/19/2022; fact discovery shall be completed by 3/20/2023; expert disclosures shall be completed by 4/3/2023; rebuttal expert witnesses shall be exchanged by 4/24/2023; all expert discovery shall be completed by 5/22/2023; and all dispositive motions, except for motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard by 6/23/2023. Motions regarding discovery shall be noticed before the Magistrate Judge, as provided by Local Rule 302(c). After consideration of the parties' comments related to settlement, the parties will notify the court of any result in private mediation no later than 5/18/2023. The parties will also notify the court whether they request a court settlement conference date or referral to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program ("VDRP") prior to any Final Pretrial Conference. The parties shall file said notification or request for referral jointly, in writing. This case schedule will become final without further order of the court unless objections are filed within fourteen (14) calendar days of this order. The schedule, once final, shall not be modified except by leave of court upon showing of good cause. All provisions of the court's standing scheduling order for Civil Cases filed concurrently herewith are incorporated therein. SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Tiphanne Crowe. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
April 26, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariel Harman-Holmes on behalf of Gene Rump, Leigh White. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 18, 2022 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Gene Rump, Leigh White. (Law, Daniel)
April 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel Albert Law on behalf of Gene Rump, Leigh White. Attorney Law, Daniel Albert added. (Law, Daniel)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Gene Rump, Leigh White. Attorney Kuemerle, Karin added. (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 1, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by FCA US, LLC. Attorney Sachs, Michael Benjamin added.(Sachs, Michael)
January 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Tionna Dolin. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 21, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: FCA US, LLC served on 1/11/2022. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A) Modified on 12/21/2021 (Coll, A).
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *FCA US LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tionna Dolin* *1840 Century Park East* *Suite 430* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Coll, A)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC by Leigh White, Gene Rump. Attorney Dolin, Tionna added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9982337) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh White
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Daniel Albert Law
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Rump
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Daniel Albert Law
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Sachs
Represented By: Reshma Bajaj
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Saishruti Mutneja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?