USA v. Marble Mountain Ranch et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Marble Mountain Ranch, Inc., Heidi A. Cole, Douglas T. Cole, Norman D. Cole and Carolyn T. Cole
Case Number: 2:2021cv02391
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Heidi A. Cole on 1/6/2022. (Morris, Emilia) Modified on 2/15/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 14, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Douglas T. Cole on 1/6/2022. (Morris, Emilia) Modified on 2/15/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 14, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Marble Mountain Ranch, Inc. on 1/6/2022. (Morris, Emilia) Modified on 2/15/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 19, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Carolyn T. Cole & Norman D. Cole served on 1/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service for Norman Cole)(Morris, Emilia)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Carolyn T. Cole, Douglas T. Cole, Heidi A. Cole, Norman D. Cole, Marble Mountain Ranch, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Emilia P. E. Morris* *2500 Tulare Street* *Suite 4401* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Coll, A)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morris, Emilia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Marble Mountain Ranch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Emilia P. E. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marble Mountain Ranch, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi A. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas T. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman D. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn T. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?