(PC) Miller v. Moseley
Plaintiff: Elijah Lee Miller
Defendant: Howard E. Moseley
Case Number: 2:2021cv02402
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order PLAINTIFF'S ADDRESS UPDATED to Salinas Valley State Prison, P.O. Box 1050, Soledad, CA 93960-1050 pursuant to notice filed 2/15/2022 in case 2:21-cv-1700. (Yin, K)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Elijah Lee Miller. (Coll, A)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Elijah Lee Miller, CDCR# AR-5509 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/27/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 1/31/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Kaminski, H)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL and EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on Elijah Lee Miller. (Kaminski, H).
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Elijah Lee Miller. (Kaminski, H)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Howard E. Moseley by Elijah Lee Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Miller v. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Lee Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard E. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?