(HC) Dearman v. California Department of Corrections
Petitioner: Ryan Alan Dearman
Respondent: California Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2021cv02412
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/24/2022 DENYING without prejudice petitioner's #9 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Ryan Alan Dearman. (Yin, K)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Ryan Alan Dearman. (Benson, A.)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 1129 East Julian St., Apt. #22, San Jose, CA 95116 by Ryan Alan Dearman. (Benson, A.)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/18/22. Consent or Decline due by 2/22/2022 (Plummer, M)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Petition for writ of habeas corpus #1 served on Tami Krenzin, Attorney General. (Plummer, M)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/14/22 DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Attorney General)(Plummer, M)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition, served on Ryan Alan Dearman. (Plummer, M)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE200118646 $5.00 HC Filing Fee fbo Ryan Alan Dearman by Ryan Alan Dearman on 1/11/2022. (Reader, L)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Huang, H)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/3/2022 ORDERING Clerk to send petitioner an "Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner" and ORDERING within 30 days, petitioner shall complete and return that form to the court or submit the $5.00 filing fee. (Henshaw, R)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and IFP application served on Ryan Alan Dearman. (Henshaw, R)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/31/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ryan Alan Dearman. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against California Department of Corrections by Ryan Alan Dearman.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Dearman v. California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ryan Alan Dearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?