(HC)Higgs v. Cates
Petitioner: Maurice D. Higgs
Respondent: B. Cates
Case Number: 2:2021cv02415
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-2415 KJM DMC (HC). (Plummer, M)
February 9, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Maurice D. Higgs. (Plummer, M)
February 8, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Eldridge, David)
January 28, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Huang, H)
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami M. Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (Henshaw, R)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/21/2022. Consent or Decline due by 2/25/2022. (cc: Tami M. Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/20/2022 DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of service of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami M. Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
January 21, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Maurice D. Higgs. (Henshaw, R)
January 7, 2022 RECEIPT number #CAE200118561 $5.00 by Maurice D. Higgs on 1/7/2022. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/31/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Reader, L)
December 28, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Maurice D. Higgs. (Reader, L)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against B. Cates by Maurice D. Higgs.(Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC)Higgs v. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maurice D. Higgs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. Cates
Represented By: David Andrew Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?