(SS) Rodriguez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sharon Nicole Rodriguez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv02421
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Fraulob, Joseph)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 4/8/2022 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) [NO BRIEFING SCHEDULE ISSUED pursuant to GO 615. Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Benson, A.)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Joseph Clayton Fraulob* *Law Offices of Hadley & Fraulob* *230 Fifth Street* *Marysville, CA 95901*. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Benson, A.)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/05/22 GRANTING #3 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING E-Service on the Commissioner of Social Security. The Clerk shall issue a summons and serve this order, summons and complaint on the Commissioner of Social Security. After e-service of the complaint, this action will be STAYED pursuant to General Order 615, and there will be no scheduling order issued. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Benson, A.)
December 29, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 28, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sharon Nicole Rodriguez. (Fraulob, Joseph)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sharon Nicole Rodriguez (Fraulob, Joseph)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Sharon Nicole Rodriguez.(Fraulob, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Rodriguez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Nicole Rodriguez
Represented By: Joseph Clayton Fraulob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?