USA v. Approx. $190,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $190,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2021mc00242
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/9/2021 EXTENDING until 12/1/2021 the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture. (Coll, A)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Filing a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/06/21 EXTENDING the date to 11/01/21 as the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture. (Benson, A.)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Filing a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture by United States of America. Attorney Khasigian, Kevin Christopher added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Khasigian, Kevin)
September 30, 2021 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED: Stipulation for Extension of time for filing a complaint or Forfeiture and/or to obtain an Indictment. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Approx. $190,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $190,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?